Futrell v. Gonzalez
Plaintiff: Joel Donte Futrell
Defendant: GJ Gonzalez
Case Number: 2:2019cv00419
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joel Donte Futrell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. If Plaintiff wishes his submission to be considered by the Court, he is DIRECTED to either remit the statutory filing fee of $350.00 or complete and submit an in forma pauperis application within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order with a copy of the Court's in forma pauperis application to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 9/10/2019. Copies mailed 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request to Proceed in forma Pauperis)(jmey, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against GJ Gonzalez (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Joel Donte Futrell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (No service copies provided.)(jmey, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Futrell v. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Donte Futrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GJ Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?