Hanks v. Shafer Law Firm
Plaintiff: Tedra Hanks, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant: John Does 1-25 and Shafer Law Firm, PC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00428
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shafer Law Firm, PC. (Best, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice for Raphael Deutsch as to Tedra Hanks, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 10/08/2019. (bboy, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Raphael Deutsch and Certification of Local Counsel Aryeh E. Stein Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6871867. by Tedra Hanks, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Stein, Aryeh)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tedra Hanks, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Stein, Aryeh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tedra Hanks, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Shafer Law Firm, PC served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019 (Stein, Aryeh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shafer Law Firm, PC. (Best, Robert)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Shafer Law Firm, PC. (Best, Robert)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Shafer shall file its answer, pleading, or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before Friday, 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 9/12/19. (afar)
September 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas Miller. #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - Motion for Enlargement of Time (bboy, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Shafer Law Firm, PC. (Best, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - Motion for Enlargement of Time by Shafer Law Firm, PC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Best, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 One Summons Issued as to Shafer Law Firm, PC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tedra Hanks, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Stein, Aryeh)
August 13, 2019 Notice of Correction re 2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that document 2 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document.(epri, )
August 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tedra Hanks. (Stein, Aryeh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6786447.), filed by Tedra Hanks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Stein, Aryeh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanks v. Shafer Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shafer Law Firm, PC
Represented By: Robert William Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tedra Hanks, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Aryeh Eliezer Stein
Represented By: Raphael Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?