NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of et al v. Fitch et al
Plaintiff: ACE American Insurance Company, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of, Allied World National Assurance Company, Interstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Defendant: MCM Management Corp. and Aaron Fitch
Case Number: 2:2019cv00430
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice for Samuel J. Pace, Jr as to ACE American Insurance Company, Allied World National Assurance Company, Chubb Custom Insurance Company, Interstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of and Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 10/1/19. (tlev, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Samuel J. Pace, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel David C. Hartnett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6860767. by ACE American Insurance Company, Allied World National Assurance Company, Chubb Custom Insurance Company, Interstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hartnett, David)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Interstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, ACE American Insurance Company, Allied World National Assurance Company, NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Chubb Custom Insurance Company. Aaron Fitch waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019; MCM Management Corp. waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019. (Hartnett, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Aaron Fitch, MCM Management Corp.NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
August 14, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert G. Doumar and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of. (Hartnett, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of. (Hartnett, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Interstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Hartnett, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Chubb Custom Insurance Company. (Hartnett, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hartnett, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by ACE American Insurance Company. (Hartnett, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Allied World National Assurance Company. (Hartnett, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of. (Hartnett, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6789161.), filed by NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hartnett, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of et al v. Fitch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: Samuel J. Pace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: Samuel J. Pace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NWM Hotel LLC, individually and for the use and benefit of
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: Samuel J. Pace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied World National Assurance Company
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: Samuel J. Pace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: Samuel J. Pace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb Custom Insurance Company
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Represented By: James L. Chapman, IV
Represented By: Samuel J. Pace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCM Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Fitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?