Baka v. City Of Norfolk, Virginia
Plaintiff: Karen Baka and Karen Baka-Branchesi
Defendant: City of Norfolk, Virginia
Case Number: 2:2019cv00458
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Norfolk, Virginia. (Beverly, Michael)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Karen Baka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit Baka Letter to EEOC, #4 Exhibit Baka Position Statment, #5 Exhibit Norfolk Position Statement)(Montgomery, Wayne)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Norfolk, Virginia. (Beverly, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Norfolk, Virginia. (Beverly, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on City of Norfolk, Virginia on 9/10/2019, filed by Karen Baka. (Montgomery, Wayne)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Norfolk, Virginia. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Karen Baka. (Montgomery, Wayne)
August 30, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6813523.), filed by Karen Baka. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EEOC Charge)(Montgomery, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baka v. City Of Norfolk, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Baka
Represented By: Wayne Barry Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Baka-Branchesi
Represented By: Wayne Barry Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Norfolk, Virginia
Represented By: Michael Angelo Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?