Thompson v. Haspell et al
Plaintiff: Harvey Thompson
Defendant: 5 John Doe, John O. Brennan, 3 John Doe, 6 John Doe, Gina Haspell, 2 John Doe, 4 John Doe and 1 John Doe
Interested Party: of America United States
Case Number: 2:2019cv00459
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Intradistrict Transfer to Alexandria Division (ldab, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:19-cv-11083. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ).
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred to Eastern District of Virginia. (Vieira, Leonardo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ALLOWING #15 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to Eastern District of Virginia. (Vieira, Leonardo) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case Venue to Eastern District of Virginia, Alexandria Division. by John O. Brennan, Gina Haspell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hackert, Connor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Connor J. Hackert on behalf of John O. Brennan, Gina Haspell (Hackert, Connor) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER: Assistant United States Attorney Annapurna Balakrishna has filed her Notice of Appearance #11 as counsel for the United States, and a further Notice of Service Deficiencies and Request to Vacate Deadlines #12 in which she notes that counsel does not represent any individual defendants or appear on their behalf. Accordingly, the clerk shall correct the docket text entered by counsel for docket entry #11 and the corresponding listing of counsel on the docket sheet to state counsel's appearance on behalf of the United States, as interested party, and not on behalf of Defendants John O. Brennan and Gina Haspell. The Notice of Service Deficiencies and Request to Vacate Deadlines #12 correctly notes that the individual Defendants have 60 days after service of the complaint to respond. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(2) (a United States officer or employee sued only in an official capacity must serve an answer... within 60 days after service on the United States attorney"); Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(3) ("a United States officer or employee sued in an individual capacity for an act or omission occurring in connection with duties performed on the United States' behalf must serve an answer to a complaint, counterclaim, or crossclaim within 60 days after service on the officer or employee or service on the United States attorney, whichever is later"). The further assertion in the Notice that "twenty-one-day summonses were erroneously issued" is not supported by the record, however, as the summons issued by the clerk and cited in the Notice is not a "twenty-one-day summons" but specifically states that a response is due within "60 days if you are... an officer or employee of the United States described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(2) or (3)." Summons #6 . The court does not address at this time whether the Affidavits of Service #8 , #9 , are sufficient as to service on John O. Brennan and Gina Haspell individually, but does find that there is no Affidavit as to service on the United States Attorney on the docket. Accordingly, the clerk shall correct the docket text entered by counsel at docket entries #8 and #9 to delete the "answer due" dates. In light of the foregoing, the clerk shall vacate the scheduling conference noticed at docket entry #10 . (MacDonald, Gail) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by John O. Brennan, Gina Haspell re #10 Notice of Scheduling Conference, #6 Summons Issued, #9 Affidavit of Service, #8 Affidavit of Service, #7 Notice of Service of Process (Balakrishna, Annapurna) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Annapurna Balakrishna on behalf of The United States. (Balakrishna, Annapurna) Modified on 8/7/2019 (MacDonald, Gail). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 VACATED 8/6/19: NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) is responsible for ensuring that all parties and/or their attorneys who have not filed an answer or appearance with the court are notified of the date of the scheduling conference. (MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 8/6/2019 (MacDonald, Gail). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Harvey Thompson. Gina Haspell served on 5/30/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Harvey Thompson. (Marano, Peter) Modified on 8/6/2019 (MacDonald, Gail). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Harvey Thompson. John O. Brennan served on 7/15/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Harvey Thompson. (Marano, Peter) Modified on 8/6/2019 (MacDonald, Gail). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Service of Process filed by Harvey Thompson. Individual(s)/Entities served: Haspell. (Marano, Peter) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kinsella, Devan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Entry filed in error by court staff. [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee/payment: $ 400, receipt number 1bst074349 for #1 Complaint (Diaz, Carmen) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Kinsella, Devan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Harvey Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kinsella, Devan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 9/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Haspell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John O. Brennan
Represented By: Connor J. Hackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Haspell
Represented By: Connor J. Hackert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey Thompson
Represented By: Peter T. Marano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: of America United States
Represented By: Annapurna Balakrishna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?