Granlund v. Childs et al
Plaintiff: Kjell R Granlund, III
Defendant: Antwuan A. Childs and XPO Logistics Drayage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00465
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Revised Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Judges Chamber. Jury Trial set for 6/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 10/31/2019. (clou )
October 29, 2019 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 6/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. Jury Trial reset for 6/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (lwoo)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller to conduct any and all further proceedings in this case. See order for details. Copies distributed as directed. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 10/11/2019. (clou )
October 11, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith no longer assigned to the case. (clou )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference is set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. Jury Trial is set for 4/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on October 10, 2019. (sche)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Antwuan A. Childs, Kjell R Granlund, III, XPO Logistics Drayage, LLC. (sche)
October 10, 2019 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 10/10/2019. (sche)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller & filed on 9/18/19. (ptom, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by XPO Logistics Drayage, LLC. (Haynes, James)
September 9, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. A financial disclosure statement was not filed with the party's first appearance as required by Local Rule 7.1. The party is allowed seven (7) days to correct the deficiency and file the financial disclosure statement. Failure to file the financial disclosure statement within this period of time will subject #1 to being stricken from the record. (epri, )
September 9, 2019 Referred for 16(b). (epri, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
September 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Antwuan A Childs, XPO Logistics Drayage, LLC.(Haynes, James)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6825855.), filed by Antwuan A Childs, XPO Logistics Drayage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haynes, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granlund v. Childs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kjell R Granlund, III
Represented By: Stephen C Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antwuan A. Childs
Represented By: James Matthew Haynes, Jr.
Represented By: Brennan Crowder Morrissett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO Logistics Drayage, LLC
Represented By: James Matthew Haynes, Jr.
Represented By: Brennan Crowder Morrissett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?