Harris v. America's Auto Auction et al
Plaintiff: James Cedric Harris and Jamaal Harris
Defendant: William Lee, Jerry Daisey and America's Auto Auction
Case Number: 2:2019cv00468
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to WILLIAM LEE @ Serve: William Lee 636 S, Military Hwy Virginia Beach VA 23464. A copy of the Complaint, the Notice of Lawsuit, two copies of the Waiver of Service form, and Order, mailed to Mr. Lee on 10/1/2019, returned to Court as undelivered. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (epri, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 Waiver of re #3 Complaint, by America's Auto Auction, Jerry Daisey, William Lee (Bean, Gregory)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against America's Auto Auction, Jerry Daisey, William Lee, filed by James Cedric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 11a, #13 Attachment)(epri, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff's IFP Application, ECF No. 1, is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare a Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Service form for Defendants. A copy of the Complaint, the Notice of Lawsuit, two copies of the Waiver of Service form, and this Order are to be sent to each Defendant at the addresses provided by Plaintiff. If any Defendant fails to waive service, the Clerk is DIRECTED to (i) issue summons, (ii) prepare a packet containing a summons, a copy of the Complaint, and this Order for any such Defendant, and (iii) deliver the packet to the United States Marshal, who is DIRECTED to serve the packet upon any such Defendant. A copy of this Order was sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 10.1.19. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis on 9/30/2019. (epri, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Cedric Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 11a, #14 Attachment)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. America's Auto Auction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cedric Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamaal Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Daisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Auto Auction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?