Smith v. School Board of the City of Virginia Beach, Virginia
Plaintiff: Deborah Aho Smith
Defendant: School Board of the City of Virginia Beach, Virginia
Case Number: 2:2019cv00469
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deborah Aho Smith. (Hogge, Raymond)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 10/31/2019. (Leonard, Lawrence)
October 31, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Leonard. #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss (afar)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Deborah Aho Smith. (Hogge, Raymond)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Morris Picco on behalf of School Board of the City of Virginia Beach, Virginia (Picco, Melissa)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Yeng Collins on behalf of School Board of the City of Virginia Beach, Virginia (Collins, Deborah)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Under FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) filed by School Board of the City of Virginia Beach, Virginia. (Collins, Deborah)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by School Board of the City of Virginia Beach, Virginia. (Collins, Deborah)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Aho Smith. School Board of the City of Virginia Beach, Virginia waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Hogge, Raymond)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Deborah Aho Smith. (Hogge, Raymond)
September 10, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6829280.), filed by Deborah Aho Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hogge, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. School Board of the City of Virginia Beach, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Aho Smith
Represented By: Raymond Lee Hogge, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Board of the City of Virginia Beach, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?