Stephenson v. Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pamela Stephenson
Defendant: Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. and Red Robin International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00474
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Red Robin International, Inc. filed by Pamela Stephenson. (bpet, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file the Amended Complaint as of the date of this Order, and the defendant shall file a response within 14 days. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/8/19. (bpet, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. The parties are DIRECTED to minimize motions to seal documents and are ORDERED to schedule a settlement conference with a Magistrate Judge of this court on or before the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/7/19 & filed on 11/8/19. (ptom, )
November 7, 2019 Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 11/7/2019. (ptom, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/15/19 & filed on 10/16/19. (ptom, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Reply to Motion re #6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc.. (Grace, Kathryn)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in Support to #6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Pamela Stephenson. (O'Hanlon, Griffin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Pamela Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(O'Hanlon, Griffin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (bpet, ).
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Griffin Murphy O'Hanlon on behalf of Pamela Stephenson (O'Hanlon, Griffin)
September 18, 2019 Refer for 16(b). (bpet, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc..(Grace, Kathryn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc.. (Grace, Kathryn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
September 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6831490.), filed by Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grace, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Stephenson
Represented By: John Mark Cooper
Represented By: Griffin Murphy O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Robin Gourmet Burgers, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Lorenz Olavson
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Represented By: Eric Lorenz Olavson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?