JEQ&Co LLC v. Defense Logistics Agency (DLA), et al
Plaintiff: JEQ&Co LLC and Jacob Queern
Defendant: Defense Logistics Agency (DLA), et al
Case Number: 2:2019cv00485
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 A binder of documentation related to FOIA Request: by Jacob Queern. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(epri, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to substitute Jacob Queern as the named Plaintiff on the docket of this matter. Plaintiff's Second IFP Application, ECF No. 4, is DENIED. If Plaintiff would like to proceed with this action, he is DIRECTED to either (i) remit the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee, or (ii) submit another IFP Application that addresses the issues raised above within thirty days of the date of entry of this Order. A copy of this Order, along with a copy of the court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 10.11.19. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 10/11/2019. (epri, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEQ&Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Accept Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Motion for leave, #4 Attachment 1, #5 Attachment 2)(epri, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by JEQ&Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(epri, )
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to print a copy of the IFP Application from the USB flash drive, and file it as a separate document on the docket of this matter. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to file the Complaint as a "Proposed Complaint - Subject to Defect for Lack of Signature," as an attached exhibit to the IFF Application. The IFP Application is DENIED at this time. If Plaintiff would like the court to proceed with this action, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a signed, Proposed Amended Complaint within thirty days from the date of entry of this Order. Plaintiff is FURTHER DIRECTED to either: (i) remit the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee, or (ii) submit a clear and complete IFP Application (that clearly identifies the named Plaintiff) to the court for consideration. A copy of this Order, along with a copy of the court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), sent to Plaintiff as DIRECTED on 9.17.19. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 9/17/2019. (epri, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JEQ&Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 [SUBJECT TO DEFECT - FOR LACK OF SIGNATURE] Proposed Complaint)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEQ&Co LLC v. Defense Logistics Agency (DLA), et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Logistics Agency (DLA), et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEQ&Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Queern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?