Wilson v. City of Chesapeake
Plaintiff: Jupiter Dennell Wilson, Sr.
Defendant: City of Chesapeake
Case Number: 2:2019cv00486
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Mark S Davis
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to strike Plaintiff's October 30, 2019 Filings, ECF Nos. 8-10, from the docket. Copies of this Order sent as DIRECTED on 11.1.19. Signed by Chief District Judge Mark S. Davis and filed on 11/1/2019. (epri, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 [STRICKEN - Pursuant to the Court's Order at 11] AFFIDAVIT WITH EXHIBITS by Jupiter Dennell Wilson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit 1A, #4 Exhibit 1A1, #5 Exhibit 1A2, #6 Exhibit 1A3, #7 Exhibit 1A4, #8 Exhibit 1A5, #9 Exhibit 1A6, #10 Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit B1, #12 Exhibit B2, #13 Exhibit B3, #14 Exhibit B4, #15 Exhibit B5)(epri, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 [STRICKEN - Pursuant to the Court's Order at 11] MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Jupiter Dennell Wilson, Sr. (epri, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 [STRICKEN - Pursuant to the Court's Order at 11] PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Jupiter Dennell Wilson, Sr. (epri, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask & filed on 10/16/19. (ptom, )
October 10, 2019 Referred for 16(b). (epri, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Chesapeake.(Hamann, Melissa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed City of Chesapeake, served on 10/2/2019. (epri, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Anne Hamann on behalf of City of Chesapeake (Hamann, Melissa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Chesapeake. Service package mailed to pro se plaintiff on 9.19.19. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Submission by Jupiter Dennell Wilson, Sr. (epri, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Chesapeake ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 24683043288.), filed by Jupiter Dennell Wilson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Receipt)(epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. City of Chesapeake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jupiter Dennell Wilson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chesapeake
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hamann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?