Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc. v. Life Protect 24/7, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc.
Defendant: Life Protect 24/7, Inc. and Does 1-10 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2019cv00500
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Henry C Morgan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held on 11/21/2019. Nigel L. Wilkinson and Ralph C. Loeb appeared for the Plaintiff. John C. Lynch appeared for the Defendant. (lbax, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 09:30 AM in Clerk's Office Conference Room, first floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 11/1/19 and filed on 11/4/19. (lhow)
October 28, 2019 Refer for 16(b) (tamarm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Protect 24/7, Inc..(Lynch, John)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael Dudley Rounds as to Life Protect 24/7, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 10/23/2019. (bboy, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 28 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Dudley Rounds and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Lynch Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6896902. by Life Protect 24/7, Inc.. (Lynch, John)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Life Protect 24/7, Inc. answer due 10/25/2019. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 10/09/2019. (tamarm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 26 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Nigel)
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Life Protect 24/7, Inc.. (Lynch, John)
October 9, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Protect 24/7, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lynch, John)
October 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Lynch on behalf of Life Protect 24/7, Inc. (Lynch, John)
October 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Maryia Yrjeuna Jones on behalf of Life Protect 24/7, Inc. (Jones, Maryia)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice for Ralph Charles Loeb as to Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 09/25/2019. (tlev, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph C. Loeb and Certification of Local Counsel Nigel L. Wilkinson Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6851967. by Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc.. (Wilkinson, Nigel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Nigel L. Wilkinson on behalf of Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc. (Wilkinson, Nigel)
September 23, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE of local counsel requirement mailed to foreign counsel. (tamarm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-06816. Original file and docket sheet received.
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA, NORFOLK DIVISION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION #15 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Case electroncially transferred to USDC Eastern District of Virginia, Norfolk Division. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Change Venue to Eastern District of Virginia, Norfolk Division filed by Defendant Life Protect 24/7, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rounds, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff, LIFE ALERT EMERGENCY RESPONSE, INC. and Defendant LIFE PROTECT 24/7, INC., by and through their respective counsel of record, having stipulated that Defendant shall have until September 19, 2019 to respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint, for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants responsive pleading shall be due on or before September 19, 2019 #13 . (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Protect 24/7, Inc. answer now due 9/19/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Life Protect 24/7, Inc..(Attorney Michael D Rounds added to party Life Protect 24/7, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rounds, Michael) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff, LIFE ALERT EMERGENCY RESPONSE, INC. and Defendant LIFE PROTECT 24/7, INC., by and through their respective counsel of record, having stipulated that Defendant shall have until September 12, 2019 to respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint #11 , for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants responsive pleading shall be due on or before September 12, 2019. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Protect 24/7, Inc. answer now due 9/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc..(Loeb, Ralph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-06816 ODW(JEMx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc., upon Defendant Life Protect 24/7, Inc. served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diane Dotson, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Loeb, Ralph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Life Protect 24/7, Inc. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc., a California corporation, identifying Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc.. (Loeb, Ralph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc., a California corporation. (Loeb, Ralph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc., a California corporation. (Loeb, Ralph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc., a California corporation. (Loeb, Ralph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24214400 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc., a California corporation. (Attorney Ralph C Loeb added to party Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc., a California corporation(pty:pla))(Loeb, Ralph) [Transferred from California Central on 9/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc. v. Life Protect 24/7, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Protect 24/7, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Dudley Rounds
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Represented By: Maryia Yrjeuna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Alert Emergency Response, Inc.
Represented By: Nigel L. Wilkinson
Represented By: Ralph Charles Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?