Hill v. The Anthem Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sierra L. Hill
Defendant: The Anthem Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00531
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Constine, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Constine, David)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Anthem Companies, Inc.. (Constine, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra L. Hill. The Anthem Companies, Inc. served on 10/30/2019. (clou)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Anthem Companies, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedure) (clou)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Sierra L. Hill. (Gaynor, Todd)
October 2, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6867720.), filed by Sierra L. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Gaynor, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. The Anthem Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Anthem Companies, Inc.
Represented By: David Edward Constine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra L. Hill
Represented By: Todd Michael Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?