Saunders et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Plaintiff: Vinita K. Saunders, Darrell K. Saunders, The Estate of William Benton and The Estate of Ethel Benton
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, McCabe, Weisberg, and Conway and Ocwen Loan Servicing
Case Number: 2:2019cv00532
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Service re #12 Memorandum in Support, #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Abby Kelley Moynihan on behalf of McCabe, Weisberg, and Conway (Moynihan, Abby)
November 14, 2019 Notice of Correction re #12 Memorandum in Support. The filing user has been directed to file a Certificate of Service re #12 . (epri, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by McCabe, Weisberg, and Conway. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of Motion filed previously herein)(Moynihan, Abby)
November 13, 2019 Notice of Correction re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro. Filing user has been directed to file the brief accompanying #10 . (epri, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McCabe, Weisberg, and Conway. (Moynihan, Abby)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by McCabe, Weisberg, and Conway. (Moynihan, Abby)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Mr. Ngo's Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Mr. Ngo as counsel for Defendant McCabe, Weisberg & Conway on the docket of this matter. Copies of this Order sent as DIRECTED on 11.6.19. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 11/5/2019. (epri, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Abby Kelley Moynihan on behalf of McCabe, Weisberg, and Conway (Moynihan, Abby)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: McCabe, Weisberg & Conway is ORDERED to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint in this court within fourteen days from the date of entry of this Order. To the extent McCabe, Weisberg & Conway chooses to file a dispositive or partially dispositive motion as its responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint, McCabe, Weisberg & Conway is DIRECTED to include a proper Roseboro Notice for Plaintiffs, in accordance with Local Civil Rule 7(K). Copies of this Order sent as DIRECTED on 10.29.19. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and filed on 10/29/2019. (epri, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Melton, Allison)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing. (Melton, Allison)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
October 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Melton, Allison)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Melton, Allison)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6873117.), filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melton, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinita K. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell K. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of William Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Ethel Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Allison Anastasia Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe, Weisberg & Conway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Allison Anastasia Melton
Represented By: Andrew Brian Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe, Weisberg, and Conway
Represented By: Abby Kelley Moynihan
Represented By: Dinh Hong Hoang Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing
Represented By: Allison Anastasia Melton
Represented By: Andrew Brian Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?