Evening Prayer, Inc. v. M/V President Roosevelt
Plaintiff: Evening Prayer, Inc.
Defendant: M/V President FD Roosevelt
In Re: M/V MAULE
Case Number: 2:2019cv00602
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/20/19. (lbax, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Pierce on behalf of M/V President FD Roosevelt (Pierce, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Refer for 16(b) (tamarm)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by M/V President FD Roosevelt.(Coberly, Mark)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by M/V President FD Roosevelt VERIFIED STATEMENT OF RIGHT OR INTEREST (Coberly, Mark)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Evening Prayer, Inc.. (Ventker, David)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6923564.), filed by Evening Prayer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Letter of Undertaking, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ventker, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2019: #3 Verification of Complaint) (epri, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evening Prayer, Inc. v. M/V President Roosevelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evening Prayer, Inc.
Represented By: David Neil Ventker
Represented By: Marissa Marriott Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: M/V MAULE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V President FD Roosevelt
Represented By: Mark T. Coberly
Represented By: Michael David Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?