JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC v. Nexgrid, LLC
Plaintiff: JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC
Defendant: Nexgrid, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00086
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Nexgrid, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Judge's Instructions)(bboy, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons by JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC. (Webster, Steven)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC. (Webster, Steven)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC. (Webster, Steven)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice for Timothy John Haller as to JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 02/21/20. (tlev, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent (epri, )
February 20, 2020 Case transferred in from Richmond Division. Case Number 3:20cv113. (epri, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy John Haller and Certification of Local Counsel Steven T. Webster Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7083873. by JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC. (Webster, Steven)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7083102.), filed by JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webster, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC v. Nexgrid, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JSDQ Mesh Technologies LLC
Represented By: Steven T. Webster
Represented By: Timothy John Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexgrid, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?