JTH TAX, LLC, et al v. Williams-Eton et al
Plaintiff: Siempretax+LLC and JTH Tax, LLC
Defendant: Maurice Williams, Ursula Cooper and Tiffany Williams-Eton
Case Number: 2:2020cv00127
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC. Ursula Cooper waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Burns, Patrick)
May 1, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC. Tiffany Williams-Eton waiver sent on 4/9/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Burns, Patrick)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 , Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter G. Siachos as certified by local counsel Patrick K. Burns for JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/30/2020. (Allen, Arenda)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying in part and deferring in part re #10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Defendants are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why preliminary injunctive relief should not be granted. Defendants shall respond within 10 days of execution of final service of process. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/27/20. (bpet, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter G. Siachos and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick K. Burns by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC. (Burns, Patrick)
April 24, 2020 Notice of Correction re #15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter G. Siachos and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick K. Burns Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7172692. The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that includes the written signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter G. Siachos and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick K. Burns Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7172692. by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC. (Burns, Patrick)
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 Waiver of Oral Argument of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC (Burns, Patrick)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 Maurice Williams' ANSWER to Complaint by Maurice Williams.(Gaynor, Todd)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 Declaration re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Burns, Patrick)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC. (Burns, Patrick)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burns, Patrick)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC Maurice Williams served on 3/28/2020, answer due 4/20/2020 (Burns, Patrick)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Maurice Williams on 3/28/2020, filed by JTH Tax, LLC, SiempretaxLLC. (Burns, Patrick)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SiempretaxLLC. (Burns, Patrick)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JTH Tax, LLC. (Burns, Patrick)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Three (3) Summons Issued as to Ursula Cooper, Maurice Williams, Tiffany Williams-Eton. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JTH TAX, LLC f/k/a JTH TAX, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Tax Service and SiempretaxLLC. (Burns, Patrick)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JTH TAX, LLC f/k/a JTH TAX, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Tax Service and SiempretaxLLC. (Burns, Patrick)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons of Tiffany Williams-Eaton, Maurice Williams and Ursula Cooper by JTH TAX, LLC f/k/a JTH TAX, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Tax Service and SiempretaxLLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Burns, Patrick)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Verified Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7106628.), filed by JTH TAX, LLC f/k/a JTH TAX, Inc., d/b/a Liberty Tax Service and SiempretaxLLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Burns, Patrick)
March 5, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH TAX, LLC, et al v. Williams-Eton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Williams
Represented By: Todd Michael Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Williams-Eton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siempretax+LLC
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?