Turner v. R & B Corporation of Virginia /dba Credit Control Corporation
Plaintiff: Free Turner
Defendant: R & B Corporation of Virginia /dba Credit Control Corporation, R & B Corporation of Virginia doing business as Credit Control Corporation and John Does 1-25
Case Number: 2:2020cv00280
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE that this matter will be dismissed agreed with prejudice by the Court unless a dismissal order is submitted by counsel within eleven (11) days from the date of this notice. This deadline may be extended only by an order of the Court obtained by counsel. (tamarm, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Free Turner (Stein, Aryeh)
July 24, 2020 Notice of Correction re #4 Summons Returned Executed: the filings user has been advised to refile the summons returned executed, to include both a copy of the summons served as well as any affidavit of service. (bpet, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Free Turner R & B Corporation of Virginia served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020 (Stein, Aryeh)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to R & B Corporation of Virginia. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
June 4, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Free Turner. (Stein, Aryeh)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7234148.), filed by Free Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Stein, Aryeh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. R & B Corporation of Virginia /dba Credit Control Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & B Corporation of Virginia /dba Credit Control Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & B Corporation of Virginia doing business as Credit Control Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Free Turner
Represented By: Aryeh Eliezer Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?