Baldwin v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Brittini N. Baldwin
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00286
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(McDonald, Esther)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #6 the Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be granted, and that Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC shall have up to and including August 7, 2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 07/01/2020. (bboy, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (McDonald, Esther)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonald, Esther)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Guzzo on behalf of Brittini N. Baldwin (Guzzo, Andrew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Cahoon Kelly on behalf of Brittini N. Baldwin (Kelly, Kristi)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
June 10, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Brittini N. Baldwin. (Nash, Casey)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7241532.), filed by Brittini N. Baldwin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nash, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Esther Slater McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittini N. Baldwin
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Represented By: Casey Shannon Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?