Hunter v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: Timothy Hunter
Respondent: of America United States
Case Number: 2:2020cv00343
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Notification of transfer of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus from the Middle District of PA (Scranton) Case No. 3:19cv2046 to the Eastern District of Virginia (Norfolk). (ldab, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-02046. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2020: #2 Prisoner Data Report (ldab, )
June 29, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION:Case transferred electronically to ED of VA (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE 1. The Report and Recommendation (Doc. 9) of Magistrate Judge Carlson is ADOPTED in its entirety. 2. The Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this matter to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, with directions that the petition be docketed in the Petitioners criminal case as a motion made pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the file on this case. (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas filed by Timothy Hunter - It is RECOMMENDED that the Court either deny this petition for a writ of habeas corpus on the grounds that the Court lacks jurisdiction to consider the petition, but without prejudice to Hunter presenting this claim to the sentencing court, or in the alternative, transfer this case to the sentencing court for its consideration. Objections to R&R due by 6/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 8, 2020. (kjn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson for the preparation of a Report and Recommendation. (eo) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 TRAVERSE by Timothy Hunter to #6 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Dalke, Samuel) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Order dated 3/25/20. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Upon consideration for the petition for writ of habeas #1 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve copies of the Petition #1 , and this Order on the Warden of LSCI Allenwood and the United States Attorney. All documents filed by the parties and by the Court shall beserved upon the United States Attorney. 2. Respondent shall file, within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, and answer to the Petition. 3. A memorandum of law shall accompany the answer. 4. Petitioner shall be permitted to file, within fourteen (14) days of the date on which the answer is filed, a reply to the answer. 5. The Court will decide whether to hold a hearing on thebasis of the Petition, Respondents answer, and if filed, Petitioner's reply. Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III on 3/25/20. (rw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order VERBAL ORDER by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner - Case Reassigned to Honorable John E. Jones, III. (jw) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Receipt of payment from TIMOTHY HUNTER in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 12/16/2019. Receipt number 333069139 processed by gangeli. (jjs) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
November 29, 2019 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 11/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
November 29, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]
November 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Timothy Hunter.(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: of America United States
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Samuel s Dalke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?