5 Star Life Insurance Company v. Kurak et al
Plaintiff: 5 Star Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Judith Ann Kurak, Janice Marie Rowe and Victoria Kurak Sievers
Case Number: 2:2020cv00355
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. Victoria Kurak Sievers waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Wright, Gibson)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. Janice Marie Rowe waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Wright, Gibson)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. Judith Ann Kurak waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Wright, Gibson)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Receipt #24683046084 for Interpleader Deposit. (clou )
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from McCandlish Holton, Gibson S. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Check, #2 Envelope)(clou, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order to Deposit Interpleader Funds in the amount of $300,000.00. Copies distributed 7/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 7/14/2020. (clou, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Janice Rowe, #2 Victoria Sievers, #3 Civil Motions Procedure) (clou )
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Janice Marie Rowe by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint Victoria Kurak Sievers by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Judith Ann Kurak by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 Brief in Support of Motion for Interpleader Deposit #4 re #1 Complaint for Interpleader filed by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson) Modified docket text and added link re brief to motion for interpleader on 7/13/2020 (clou ).
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Wright, Gibson)
July 6, 2020 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. Filing user has been directed to refile the Financial Disclosure statement as a separate docket entry. (epri, )
July 2, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (clou, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7281723.), filed by 5 Star Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Plaintiff Financial Interest Disclosure Statement)(Wright, Gibson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 5 Star Life Insurance Company v. Kurak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Ann Kurak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Marie Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Kurak Sievers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5 Star Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Represented By: Lawrence Alexis Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?