Gehant v. Crane Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jerome J. Gehant
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company, CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., Viacom, Inc. successor by merger to CBS Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Inc. f/k/a Gardner Denver Holdings, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to The Nash Engineering Company, Trane Technologies PLC, f/k/a Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company, as success in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company, Aldrich Pump LLC, as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand. and The Nash Engineering Company, General Electric Company, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., Warren Pumps, LLC, Crane Co., Gardner Denver Holdings, Inc., Murray Boiler LLC, recepient of certain asses and liabilities for Trane US Inc., as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Trane Technologies PLC, as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company, CBS Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Inc., individually and as successor in interest to The Nash Engineering Company, Murray Boiler LLC, recepient of certain assets and liabilities for Trane US Inc., as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company, IMO Industries, Inc., as successor in interest to IMO DeLaval Inc., Transamerica DeLaval, Inc., DeLaval Turbine Inc., and Delaval Steam Turbine Company, Ingersoll Rand Company individually and as successor in interest to The Nash Engineering Company, Aldrich Pump LLC, as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company, Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company, Crane Co., individually and as successor in interest to Chapman Valve Co., Deming Co., and Pacific Valves, Inc. and Gardner Denver Holdings, Inc.,
Case Number: 2:2020cv00381
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 , a First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Clark as certified by local counsel Nathan Finch for Jerome J. Gehant. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 8/21/2020. (Allen, Arenda)
August 19, 2020 Filing 21 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Meredith Clark and Certification of Local Counsel Nathan Finch Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7358416. by Jerome J. Gehant. (Finch, Nathan) Modified docket text on 8/20/2020 (clou, ).
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 Stipulation of Dismissal Pursant to Rule 41 as to ViacomCBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation by Jerome J. Gehant. (Finch, Nathan) Modified docket text on 8/12/2020 (clou ).
August 11, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Company individually and as successor in interest to The Nash Engineering Company. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.. (Poretz, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump, Inc.. (Brisker, Malcolm)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Taddeo, Anthony)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Joinder in Notice of Removal by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Taddeo, Anthony)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Brunick, Timothy)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by IMO Industries, Inc., as successor in interest to IMO DeLaval Inc., Transamerica DeLaval, Inc., DeLaval Turbine Inc., and Delaval Steam Turbine Company. (Brunick, Timothy)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Warren Pumps, LLC. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Viking Pump, Inc.(epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CBS Corporation. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ingersoll-Rand Inc., individually and as successor in interest to The Nash Engineering Company. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 Copy OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by IMO Industries, Inc., as successor in interest to IMO DeLaval Inc., Transamerica DeLaval, Inc., DeLaval Turbine Inc., and Delaval Steam Turbine Company. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Electric Company. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Crane Co., individually and as successor in interest to Chapman Valve Co., Deming Co., and Pacific Valves, Inc. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Crane Co.. (Wiemken, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7313368.), filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3-1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3-2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3-3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3-4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4-1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4-2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 4-3, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Wiemken, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gehant v. Crane Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm Sean Brisker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc. successor by merger to CBS Corporation
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Inc. f/k/a Gardner Denver Holdings, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane Technologies PLC, f/k/a Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company, as success in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrich Pump LLC, as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand. and The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Anthony Berardo Taddeo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, successor by merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Timothy S. Brunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Christopher John Wiemken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Boiler LLC, recepient of certain asses and liabilities for Trane US Inc., as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Berardo Taddeo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane Technologies PLC, as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Inc., individually and as successor in interest to The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Boiler LLC, recepient of certain assets and liabilities for Trane US Inc., as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., as successor in interest to IMO DeLaval Inc., Transamerica DeLaval, Inc., DeLaval Turbine Inc., and Delaval Steam Turbine Company
Represented By: Timothy S. Brunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company individually and as successor in interest to The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrich Pump LLC, as successor in interest to Ingersoll Rand Inc. and The Nash Engineering Company
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Public Limited Company
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co., individually and as successor in interest to Chapman Valve Co., Deming Co., and Pacific Valves, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher John Wiemken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver Holdings, Inc.,
Represented By: Henry N. Ware, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Poretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome J. Gehant
Represented By: Nathan David Finch
Represented By: Meredith Kay Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?