Vousoghian v. Life Protect 24/7, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheila Vousoghian
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Life Protect 24/7, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00382
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sheila Vousoghian. Life Protect 24/7, Inc. waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (North, Christopher)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice for Daniel A. Edelman as to Sheila Vousoghian. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/6/20. (tlev, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Heather Kolbus as to Sheila Vousoghian. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/5/20. (tlev, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Cathleen M. Combs as to Sheila Vousoghian. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 8/5/20. (tlev, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel A. Edelman and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher Colt North by Sheila Vousoghian. (Attachments: #1 attachments)(North, Christopher)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Cathleen M. Combs and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher Colt North by Sheila Vousoghian. (Attachments: #1 attachments)(North, Christopher)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Heather Kolbus and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher Colt North by Sheila Vousoghian. (Attachments: #1 attachments)(North, Christopher)
July 24, 2020 Notice of Correction re #6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel A. Edelman and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher Colt North: Counsel is advised that the Court requires a handwritten signature from the applicant applying to appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is required to re-file the motion with the corrected signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (bboy, )
July 24, 2020 Notice of Correction re #5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Cathleen M. Combs and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher Colt North: Counsel is advised that the Court requires a handwritten signature from the applicant applying to appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is required to re-file the motion with the corrected signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (bboy, )
July 24, 2020 Notice of Correction re #4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Heather Kolbus and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher Colt North: Counsel is advised that the Court requires a handwritten signature from the applicant applying to appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is required to re-file the motion with the corrected signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (bboy, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel A. Edelman and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher Colt North Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7316589. by Sheila Vousoghian. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(North, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Cathleen M. Combs and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher Colt North Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7316577. by Sheila Vousoghian. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(North, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Heather Kolbus and Certification of Local Counsel Christopher Colt North Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7316488. by Sheila Vousoghian. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(North, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Protect 24/7, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
July 22, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Sheila Vousoghian. (North, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7313435.), filed by Sheila Vousoghian. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(North, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vousoghian v. Life Protect 24/7, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Protect 24/7, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Vousoghian
Represented By: Christopher Colt North
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Represented By: Heather Kolbus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?