The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00412
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Refer for 16(b) (tamarm, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Westfield Insurance Company.(Meissner, Noah)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Copies distributed to all counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/3/2020. (clou )
September 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard. #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (clou )
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westfield Insurance Company. (Meissner, Noah)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Westfield Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meissner, Noah)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint for Westfield Insurance Company served on CT Corporation System on 8/17/2020, filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Harvey, James)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Westfield Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
August 12, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Harvey, James)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Harvey, James)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7347562.), filed by The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harvey, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America for the use and benefit of E. G. Middleton, Inc.
Represented By: James Richard Harvey, III
Represented By: Daniel Allen Duane Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westfield Insurance Company
Represented By: Noah Renard Meissner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?