Pierucci v. Homes.com Incorporated
Plaintiff: Lisa Pierucci
Defendant: Homes.com Incorporated and Dominion Enterprises Incorporated
Intervenor: of America United States
Case Number: 2:2020cv00455
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Norfolk Office
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 38 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 3:20-cv-08048. Original file and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - Homes.com's Motion to Transfer (Doc. #13 ) is granted. Homes.com's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #14 ), Motion to Strike (Doc. #15 ) and Motion to Stay (Doc. #28 ) are denied without prejudice. This case shall be transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/10/20. (DXD) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE re: Recent Authority re: Defendant's Motion to Stay by Homes.com Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Troutman, Eric) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE re: Defendant Homes.com, Inc. of Recent Authority re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue for Forum Non Conveniens by Homes.com Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Troutman, Eric) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE re: Notice by Defendant Homes.Com, Inc. of Recent Authority re: Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court's Decision in Facebook, Inc. v. Duguid by Homes.com Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Troutman, Eric) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE re: Recent Authority re Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court's Decision in Facebook Inc. v. Duguid by Homes.com Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Troutman, Eric) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States' request for an extension of time to determine whether to intervene (Doc. #30 ) is granted. The United States shall have until October 6, 2020 to determine whether to intervene. Defendant's motion to stay (Doc. #28 ) will be ruled on in due course, and if granted, the United States shall have 60 days from the date the stay is lifted to determine whether to intervene. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/4/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #28 MOTION to Stay Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court's Decision in Facebook Inc. v. Duguid, Case No. 19-511 filed by Homes.com Incorporated. (Troutman, Eric) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE re: Acknowledgment of Constitutional Question and Request for Additional Time to Intervene by United States of America re: #17 Notice (Other) . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abbuhl, Joshua) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #28 MOTION to Stay Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court's Decision in Facebook Inc. v. Duguid, Case No. 19-511 filed by Lisa Pierucci. (Brown, Nathanael) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay Defendant's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court's Decision in Facebook Inc. v. Duguid, Case No. 19-511 by Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE re: Withdraw a Portion of Motion to Dismiss the Class Action Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Homes.com Incorporated re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 26 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court's Decision and Memorandum in Support of Motion by Defendant Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Remark: Out of state attorney Katy Spicer removed as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #15 MOTION to Strike Class Definition or, Alternatively, to Dismiss or Strike Nationwide Class Allegations and Memornadum in Support of Motion filed by Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court's Decision and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case ,or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue for Forum Non Conveniens and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case ,or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue for Forum Non Conveniens and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Lisa Pierucci. (Brown, Nathanael) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lisa Pierucci. (Brown, Nathanael) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Strike Class Definition or, Alternatively, to Dismiss or Strike Nationwide Class Allegations and Memornadum in Support of Motion filed by Lisa Pierucci. (Brown, Nathanael) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court's Decision and Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Lisa Pierucci. (Brown, Nathanael) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Amy Brown Doolittle on behalf of Defendant Homes.com Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE re: Constitutional Challenge to the Telephone Consumer Protection Act by Homes.com Incorporated . (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 16 **WITHDRAWN by Doc. #26 ** MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court's Decision and Memorandum in Support of Motion by Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) Modified on 7/7/2020 (DXD). [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike Class Definition or, Alternatively, to Dismiss or Strike Nationwide Class Allegations and Memornadum in Support of Motion by Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 14 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and Memorandum in Support of Motion by Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) *Modified to correct event on 6/9/2020 (DXD). [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case ,or In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue for Forum Non Conveniens and Memorandum in Support of Motion by Homes.com Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homes.com Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Landmark Media Enterprises, LLC for Homes.com Incorporated. (Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Eric J Troutman on behalf of Defendant Homes.com Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Party. Defendant Dominion Enterprises, Inc. is dropped from this action, and Homes.com, Inc. is added. The Clerk shall update the docket and the caption to reflect this change. The deadline for Homes.com to respond to the complaint is extended to 6/8/20. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/3/20. (DXD) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party: substituting Homes.com in place of Dominion Enterprises, Inc. by Dominion Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion (Doc. #8 ) is granted. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to June 3, 2020. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/30/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by Dominion Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Norris, David) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lisa Pierucci: Proof of Service re: Summons in a civil action as to Dominion Enterprises Incorporated upon Robin Hutt-Banks on 4/13/20. (Brown, Nathanael) *Modified text on 4/16/2020 (DXD). [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on June 3, 2020, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/26/20. (MAW) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Avi Kaufman on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Pierucci. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Robert R Ahdoot on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Pierucci. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dominion Enterprises Incorporated. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18030377. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-8048-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Lisa Pierucci. (Brown, Nathanael) (MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18030377 filed by Lisa Pierucci. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierucci v. Homes.com Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Pierucci
Represented By: Robert R. Ahdoot
Represented By: Nathanael Melvin Brown
Represented By: Avi Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homes.com Incorporated
Represented By: David Sean Norris
Represented By: Eric J. Troutman
Represented By: Amy Brown Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: David Sean Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: of America United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?