AutoStore Technology AS v. Ocado Group plc et al
Plaintiff: AutoStore Technology AS
Defendant: Ocado Solutions USA, Inc., Ocado Group plc, Ocado Solutions Ltd., Ocado Central Services Ltd., Ocado Innovation Ltd. and Ocado Operating Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00494
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:281
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Stay. The are parties are FURTHER ORDERED to file a joint status report every 180 days from the date of this order, until the U.S. ITC proceedings are concluded. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/20/20. (bpet, )
November 20, 2020 Telephone Conference before District Judge Raymond A. Jackson held on 11/20/2020. (ptom, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Stay (Unopposed Motion to Stay Plaintiff's Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1659) filed by Ocado Central Services Ltd., Ocado Group plc, Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Operating Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd., Ocado Solutions USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tata, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay (Unopposed Motion to Stay Plaintiff's Claims Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1659) by Ocado Central Services Ltd., Ocado Group plc, Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Operating Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd., Ocado Solutions USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tata, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Filing 17 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ocado Central Services Ltd., Ocado Group plc, Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Operating Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd., Ocado Solutions USA, Inc.. (Tata, Robert)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendants shall file their response to the #1 Complaint by 12/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 10/30/20. (bpet, )
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Joint Motion to Extend the Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint and Memorandum in Support) by Ocado Central Services Ltd., Ocado Group plc, Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Operating Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd., Ocado Solutions USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tata, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Martin Tata on behalf of Ocado Central Services Ltd., Ocado Group plc, Ocado Innovation Ltd., Ocado Operating Ltd., Ocado Solutions Ltd., Ocado Solutions USA, Inc. (Tata, Robert)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Joseph Allen Loy as to AutoStore Technology AS. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/27/20. (tlev, )
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Karthik Ravishankar as to AutoStore Technology AS. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/27/20. (tlev, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AutoStore Technology AS Ocado Solutions USA, Inc. served on 10/14/2020, answer due 11/4/2020 (Noona, Stephen)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Craig Crandall Reilly terminated. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 10/13/20. (bpet, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ocado Solutions USA, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil motions procedures) (bpet, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, Ocado Solutions USA Inc. by AutoStore Technology AS. (Noona, Stephen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AutoStore Technology AS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edward Noona on behalf of AutoStore Technology AS (Noona, Stephen)
October 1, 2020 Case transferred in from Alexandria Division. Case Number 1:20cv1149. (epri, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Karthik Ravishankar and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7425039. by AutoStore Technology AS. (Reilly, Craig)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph A. Loy and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7425038. by AutoStore Technology AS. (Reilly, Craig)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by AutoStore Technology AS re #1 Complaint, Report of Filing an Action Regarding a Patent (Reilly, Craig)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AutoStore Technology AS. (Reilly, Craig)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7425024.), filed by AutoStore Technology AS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reilly, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AutoStore Technology AS v. Ocado Group plc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AutoStore Technology AS
Represented By: Gregg Francis LoCascio
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Represented By: Paul Fredrick Brinkman
Represented By: Karthik Ravishankar
Represented By: Stephen Edward Noona
Represented By: Joseph Allen Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocado Solutions USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Martin Tata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocado Group plc
Represented By: Robert Martin Tata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocado Solutions Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Martin Tata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocado Central Services Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Martin Tata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocado Innovation Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Martin Tata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocado Operating Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Martin Tata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?