Rodriguez v. Andrews
Petitioner: Jose A. Rodriguez Rodriguez
Respondent: Justin Andrews
Case Number: 2:2020cv00604
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert G Doumar
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Jose A. Rodriguez Rodriguez. Objections to R&R Deadline 2/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 1/28/2020. Copies mailed 1/28/2021.(jmey, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. It is ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Petitioner must accomplish one of the following actions: 1. Remit $5.00 filing fee. 2. Complete and submit to the Clerk of this Court an "Affidavit in Support of Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis." The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order and two copies of an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, with the case number affixed, to the Petitioner. The Petitioner is DIRECTED to file one copy of the form with the court and retain the other copy for his records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 12/16/2020. Copies mailed 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request to Proceed in forma Pauperis)(jmey, )
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REFERRAL ORDER. It is ORDERED that this matter is hereby REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller for further proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this referral Order to Petitioner. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 12/10/2020. Copies mailed 12/10/2020.(jmey, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 2 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, )
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION, Conditionally filed (SUBJECT TO DEFECT) for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Jose A. Rodriguez Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) Modified on 12/3/2020 to edit filed on date. (jmey, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose A. Rodriguez Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Justin Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?