United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Merck & Co, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Schering-Plough Corp. and Schering Corp.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01005
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-01909. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) transferring case to the Eastern District of Virginia per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Rebecca Beach Smith.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/6/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Hammish P.M. Hume, Abby L. Dennis, Edward H. Takashima, Judith A. Zahid, Eric W. Buetzow, James R. Martin, Jennifer Duncan Hackett as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/6/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd., MSP Singapore Co. LLC, Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Schering Corp., Schering-Plough Corp.. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/6/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Antitrust list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1909 DSD/DTS. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/6/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff United HealthCare Services, Inc.. (Kniffen, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/6/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Limited, MSP Singapore Company LLC, Merck & Co., Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Schering Corporation, Schering-Plough Corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8032238) filed by United HealthCare Services, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kniffen, Elizabeth) [Transferred from Minnesota on 10/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United HealthCare Services, Inc. v. Merck & Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSP Singapore Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering-Plough Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Kniffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?