Olenych v. Dillard's Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nadine Olenych
Defendant: Dillard Store Services, Inc., Dillard's Inc. and Higbee SALVA, LP
Case Number: 2:2021cv00042
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court ACCEPTS Defendant's filing (ECF No. 12) as sufficient to establish that subject matter jurisdiction exists in this action. The case shall proceed pursuant to the previously entered Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. (ECF No. 13.)Copies of Order sent as DIRECTED on 2.23.21. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young and filed on 2/22/2021. (epri, )
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Status Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 01:45 PM in Norfolk Remote before District Judge Roderick C. Young. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 2/22/21. (jjon)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Higbee SALVA, LP Amended Notice of Removal (Cafritz, Brian)
February 22, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Roderick C. Young: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2021. The Plaintiff appeared through Anthony Gantous. The defendant appeared through Brian Cafritz. The Court directed counsel to file further briefing addressing subject matter jurisdiction as it pertains to diversity of citizenship. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Jill Trail, OCR.)(jjon)
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Higbee SALVA, LP Amended Notice of Removal (Cafritz, Brian)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly, within seven (7) days of the date hereof, Defendant shall file an Amended Notice of Removal that includes the specific information required for the Court to determine whether subject matter jurisdiction based on diversity of citizenship exists in this matter. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young and filed on 2/17/2021. (epri, )
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Higbee SALVA, LP.(Cafritz, Brian)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Higbee SALVA, LP, filed by Nadine Olenych.(Gantous, Anthony)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint, ECF No. 6, is GRANTED. The Plaintiff is ORDERED to file the Amended Complaint within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. Copies of Order sent as DIRECTED on 2.12.21. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young and filed on 2/12/2021. (epri, )
February 11, 2021 Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. All motions, unless otherwise directed by the Court and except as noted in subsection 7(F)(2) of the US District Court Eastern District of Virginia local Civil Rules, shall be accompanied by a written brief setting forth a concise statement of the facts and supporting reasons. (epri, )
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Nadine Olenych. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gantous, Anthony)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 09:45 AM via ZOOM before District Judge Roderick C. Young. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 1/22/21. (jsau, )
January 21, 2021 Referred for 16(b). (epri, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Dillard Store Services, Inc., Dillard's Inc.. (epri, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dillard's Inc.. (Cafritz, Brian)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7590309.), filed by Dillard's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cafritz, Brian)
January 20, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olenych v. Dillard's Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard Store Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Allen Cafritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillard's Inc.
Represented By: Brian Allen Cafritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higbee SALVA, LP
Represented By: Brian Allen Cafritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Olenych
Represented By: Joshua James Coe
Represented By: Anthony Michael Gantous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?