Thomas v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.
Plaintiff: Monique Thomas
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 2:2021cv00164
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Monique Thomas. (Booth, Edwin)
May 12, 2021 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Moore, Joseph)
May 12, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Moore, Joseph)
May 11, 2021 Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk Remote before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (btit)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Settlement Conference Order. Scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on July 12,2021 via Zoomgov Remote. The parties must submit a brief memorandum of five pages or less directly to chambers (do not file in the clerk's office) by noon on July 6,2021. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 5/11/21. (dbra, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Gibson Sinclair Wright on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Wright, Gibson)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. It is hereby ADJUDGED, ORDERED,AND DECREED that "Wal-Mart Stores East, LP" shall be substituted as the defendant inplace of "Wal-Mart, Inc." to reflect the correct business entity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 5/6/21. (dbra, )
May 5, 2021 Filing 12 Brief in Support to #11 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Monique Thomas. (Booth, Edwin)
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Monique Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Booth, Edwin)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED PROTECTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 4/30/2021. (afar)
April 30, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Krask. #8 Consent MOTION for Protective Order (dbra, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 Consent MOTION for Protective Order filed by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Moore, Joseph)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Joseph)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Status Conference set for 11/1/2021 at 09:25 AM in Norfolk Remote before District Judge Roderick C. Young. Parties to contact chambers of magistrate judge by 4/26/21 to schedule settlement conference in this matter. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 4/21/21. (jjon)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the state court demurrer. (ECFNo. 1-2.) Should the Defendant seek to pursue dismissal of any of Plaintiffs claims, the Court ORDERS that they file a motion to dismiss within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 4/21/2021. (afar)
April 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Roderick C. Young: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/21/2021. Plaintiff appeared through Edwin Booth. Defendant appeared through Joseph Moore. The matter was set for a status conference and the Court is to issue a Scheduling Order. (Court Reporter Jill Trail, OCR.) (jjon)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2021 at 09:55 AM in Norfolk Remote before District Judge Roderick C. Young. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 3/30/21. (jjon)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart, Inc. (epri, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Moore, Joseph)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7694065.), filed by Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Demurrer and Brief in Support, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Joseph)
March 29, 2021 Referred for 16(b). (epri, )
March 29, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Joseph Michael Moore
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Thomas
Represented By: Edwin Stuart Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?