De Sa et al v. Andy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronique De Sa, Julieanne Domnissey and Rachel Phonhsavath
Defendant: Andy, Inc., Robert L. Brown, Jr., Headlights, LLC, Andy, Inc. a Virginia Corporation doing business as Headlights Gold Gentlemen's Club, DOE Managers 1 through 3 and Does 4 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv00334
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Arenda L Wright Allen
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' Motion is granted and the Defendants shall have until August 17, 2021 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/4/21. (dbra, )
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading by Andy, Inc., Robert L. Brown, Jr, DOE Managers 1 through 3, Does 4 through 10, inclusive, Headlights, LLC. (Holadia, Manolita) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (dbra, ).
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 8/3/21. (dbra, )
August 3, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Leonard. #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading (dbra, )
July 27, 2021 Notice of Correction re #11 Notice of Appearance: The signature block on the document does not match the filing user's login. The attorney whose signature appears on the document must use their own login and refile the document. (dbra, )
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Manolita A. Holadia on behalf of Andy, Inc., Robert L. Brown, Jr, DOE Managers 1 through 3, Does 4 through 10, inclusive, Headlights, LLC (Holadia, Manolita)
July 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronique De Sa, Julieanne Domnissey Robert L. Brown, Jr served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Summons & Affidavit of Service re Robert L. Brown, Jr.)(Long, David)
July 26, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronique De Sa, Julieanne Domnissey Andy, Inc. served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Summons & Affidavit of Service re Andy, Inc.)(Long, David)
July 26, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Leonard. #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (dbra, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Andy, Inc., Robert L. Brown, Jr, DOE Managers 1 through 3, Does 4 through 10, inclusive, Headlights, LLC. (Holadia, Manolita) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2021: #1 Proposed Order) (dbra, ).
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronique De Sa, Julieanne Domnissey Headlights, LLC served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Executed Summons re Headlights LLC)(Long, David)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Rachel Phonhsavath's Individual Claims by Rachel Phonhsavath (Long, David)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andy, Inc., Robert L. Brown, Jr, Headlights, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Motion Procedures)(afar)
June 11, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (afar)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Robert L. Brown, Jr. by Ronique De Sa, Julieanne Domnissey, Rachel Phonhsavath. (Long, David)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Headlights, LLC by Ronique De Sa, Julieanne Domnissey, Rachel Phonhsavath. (Long, David)
June 10, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, to Andy Inc. dba Headlights Gold Gentlemen's Club by Ronique De Sa, Julieanne Domnissey, Rachel Phonhsavath. (Long, David)
June 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7836627.), filed by Ronique De Sa, Rachel Phonhsavath, Julieanne Domnissey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - De Sa Consent Form, #3 Exhibit 2 - Domnissey Consent Form, #4 Exhibit 3 - Phonhsavath Consent Form)(Long, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Sa et al v. Andy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronique De Sa
Represented By: David Avard Chipman Long
Represented By: Suzanne Sones Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julieanne Domnissey
Represented By: David Avard Chipman Long
Represented By: Suzanne Sones Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Phonhsavath
Represented By: David Avard Chipman Long
Represented By: Suzanne Sones Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Manolita A. Holadia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Headlights, LLC
Represented By: Manolita A. Holadia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy, Inc. a Virginia Corporation doing business as Headlights Gold Gentlemen's Club
Represented By: Manolita A. Holadia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Managers 1 through 3
Represented By: Manolita A. Holadia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4 through 10, inclusive
Represented By: Manolita A. Holadia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?