Conopco, Inc. v. Rebel Smuggling, LLC
Plaintiff: Conopco, Inc. doing business as Food Service Direct
Defendant: Rebel Smuggling, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00347
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leonard
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rebel Smuggling, LLC answer due 8/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 7/23/2021. (jmey, )
July 22, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . (jmey, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Rebel Smuggling, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Lance) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/22/2021) (jmey, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/22/2021) (jmey, ).
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Conopco, Inc. Rebel Smuggling, LLC served on 7/7/2021, answer due 7/28/2021 (Mytelka, Craig)
June 23, 2021 Filing 9 Report on the filing or determination of a copyright. (epri, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Rebel Smuggling, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mytelka, Craig)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mytelka, Craig)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Yiorgos Lycourgos Koliopoulos on behalf of Conopco, Inc. (Koliopoulos, Yiorgos)
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Howard Brannon on behalf of Conopco, Inc. (Brannon, Clinton)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Conopco, Inc.. (Mytelka, Craig)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Conopco, Inc.. (Mytelka, Craig)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7855549.), filed by Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mytelka, Craig)
June 23, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conopco, Inc. v. Rebel Smuggling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conopco, Inc. doing business as Food Service Direct
Represented By: Clinton Howard Brannon
Represented By: Craig Lawrence Mytelka
Represented By: Yiorgos Lycourgos Koliopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebel Smuggling, LLC
Represented By: Lance G. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?