Britt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joanne Britt
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00348
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Roderick C Young
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant shall have an extension of time up to and including Friday, October 29, 2021, in which to file an answer and the certified administrative record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 8/20/21. (dbra, )
August 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jebby Rasputnis, #2 Proposed Order)(McKenzie, Anna)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security (as to Attorney General) served on 7/6/2021 (dbra, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security (as to United States Attorney) served on 7/1/2021, (dbra, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Melissa A. Palmer as to Joanne Britt. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 6/25/21. (tlev, )
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 Three Summons issued and delivered to USM as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(dbra, )
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Melissa A. Palmer and Certification of Local Counsel John O. Goss Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7856057. by Joanne Britt. (Goss, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Joanne Britt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM-285 Forms, #4 USM-285 Forms, #5 USM-285 Form)(Goss, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joanne Britt. (Goss, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Joanne Britt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goss, John)
June 23, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Britt v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Britt
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Anna M. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA (Social Security Administration)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?