Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc v. Merck & Company Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Defendant: Merck & Company Inc., Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA, merck sharpe & dohme corporation, Shering-Plough Corporation, Schering Corporation, MSP Singapore Company LLC and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00514
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Miller
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Intradistrict Transfer to Norfolk MDL Case Numbering System, 2:21cv1006 (afar)
September 17, 2021 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-05497. Original file and docket sheet received.
September 17, 2021 Notification of transfer of Petition for Removal from the Northern District of CA Case No. 4:21cv5497 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
September 16, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Virginia (Norfolk). Counsel notified (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
August 20, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc.. Service waived by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons - Merck & Company, Inc., #2 Waiver of Service of Summons - Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, #3 Waiver of Service of Summons - MSP Singapore Company LLC, #4 Waiver of Service of Summons - Schering Corporation, #5 Waiver of Service of Summons - Schering-Plough Corporation, #6 Waiver of Service of Summons - Glenmark Pharmaceuticals LTD, #7 Waiver of Service of Summons - Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USALTD)(Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 8/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
August 4, 2021 Filing 17 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) MDL No. 2836: Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of Virginia, Norfolk. Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 08/04/21. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 26, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by October 19, 2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-05497-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 08/02/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc... (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Allen Sasse on behalf of Plaintiff Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Sasse, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Eric J. Stock representing Defendant Merck & Company Inc. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Eric Stock on behalf of the Specially Appearing Merck Defendants ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16187799.) filed by Merck & Company Inc.. (Stock, Eric) (Filed on 7/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck & Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc.,, Other Affiliate Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Other Affiliate Schering Corp., Other Affiliate Schering-Plough Corp., Other Affiliate MSP Singapore Co. LLC for Merck & Company Inc.. re #4 Notice of Appearance (Dusseault, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Dean Dusseault , Samuel G. Liversidge, and Eric J. Stock on Behalf of Specially Appearing Merck Defendants (Dusseault, Christopher) (Filed on 7/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA identifying Corporate Parent Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd for Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA. re #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Notice of Removal, (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey T. Holtz on Behalf of Specially Appearing Defendants Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd. and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-21-592508. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number 0971-16186480). Filed by Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Holtz, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2021) Modified on 7/20/2021 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc v. Merck & Company Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Allen Sasse
Represented By: Diane A. Shrewsbury
Represented By: Kent A. Gardiner
Represented By: Mark M. Supko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Company Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA
Represented By: Geoffrey T. Holtz
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: merck sharpe & dohme corporation
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shering-Plough Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSP Singapore Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher Dean Dusseault
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Samuel Grant Liversidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Represented By: Geoffrey T. Holtz
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?