Baker v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Tabitha Baker
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00555
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Raymond A Jackson
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 11/8/2021. (jhie, )
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM. Attorney General of the United States served on 11/10/2021. (jhie, )
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued and Delivered to USM as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285 forms, #2 Civil motions procedures)(jhie, )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting application to proceed without prepayment of fees. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 11/2/21. (jhie, )
September 30, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tabitha Baker. (Richardson, Barrett)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tabitha Baker. (Richardson, Barrett)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Tabitha Baker. (Richardson, Barrett)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Tabitha Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 IFP Application)(Richardson, Barrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Baker
Represented By: Barrett Rives Richardson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?