McCants v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tonya Latrell McCants
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00667
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM. United States Attorney served on 1/27/2022. (jhie, )
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM. Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/7/2022 (jhie, )
January 20, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM. United States Attorney General served on 1/12/2022 (jhie, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued and Delivered to USM as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285 forms, #2 Civil motions procedures)(jhie, )
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 1/3/22. (jhie, )
December 23, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (afar)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Tonya Latrell McCants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 USM-285 Form, #4 USM-285 Form, #5 USM-285 Form)(Goss, John)
December 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Tonya Latrell McCants. (Goss, John)
December 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint , filed by Tonya Latrell McCants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Exhibit B: Proof of Name Change (Driver's License), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goss, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCants v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Latrell McCants
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?