Humana Inc. v. Merck & Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Humana Inc
Defendant: Merck & Company Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation, Schering-Plough Corporation, Schering Corporation and Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01007
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:21-cv-17355. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Eastern District of Virginia.(MDL 2836 In Re: Zetia (Ezetimibe) Antitrust Litigation - Judge Rebecca Beach Smith) (gh, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/19/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., MERCK & COMPANY, INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, SCHERING CORPORATION, SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/19/2021.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by HUMANA INC. [Notice of Tag-Along and Request to Transfer to an MDL] (Attachments: #1 Ex. A to Notice of Tag-Along and Request to Transfer.)(CHAKRABARTI, PREETHA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/19/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/19/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUMANA INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (CHAKRABARTI, PREETHA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/19/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLENMARK PHARMACEUTICALS LTD., MERCK & COMPANY, INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, SCHERING CORPORATION, SCHERING-PLOUGH CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12824384) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HUMANA INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CHAKRABARTI, PREETHA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humana Inc. v. Merck & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana Inc
Represented By: Preetha Chakrabarti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering-Plough Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?