Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman v. EVE Energy North American Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman
Defendant: EVE Energy North American Corporation and Mohammed Dahmash doing business as Virginia Beach Tobacco, Inc. and Virginia Beach Tobacco and Vape
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Mohammed Dahmash
3Rd Party Defendant: William Johns, Premium Estore LLC and Ecigsdirect.us
Case Number: 2:2022cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Rebecca Beach Smith
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice for William Neil Clark, Jr as to Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman. Signed by District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 3/1/22. (tlev, )
February 28, 2022 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Neil Clark, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel David C. Hartnett by Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman. (Hartnett, David)
February 28, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Eve Energy North American Corporation by Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman. (Hartnett, David)
February 24, 2022 Notice of Correction re #12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Neil Clark, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel David C. Hartnett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8259043. The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that includes the written signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Neil Clark, Jr. and Certification of Local Counsel David C. Hartnett Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8259043. by Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman. (Hartnett, David)
February 11, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Responsive pleadings to the complaint have not been filed by defendant EVE Energy North American Corporation. Counsel is requested to file a status report within fifteen (15) days from the date of this notice. The status report should be in the form of a pleading that conforms to ECF Policies and Procedures. (jhie, )
February 1, 2022 Filing 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mohammed Dahmash. (Voyles, Shawn)
February 1, 2022 Filing 10 Third Party Complaint against William Johns, Premium Estore LLC, ecigsdirect.us, filed by Mohammed Dahmash.(Voyles, Shawn)
February 1, 2022 Filing 9 CROSSCLAIM against EVE Energy North American Corporation, filed by Mohammed Dahmash.(Voyles, Shawn)
February 1, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Mohammed Dahmash.(Voyles, Shawn)
January 25, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Mohammed Dahmash on 01/11/2022, filed by Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman. (Hartnett, David)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service on the Secretary of the Commonwealth (jhie, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Mohammed Dahmash, EVE Energy North American Corporation, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
January 7, 2022 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman. (Hartnett, David)
January 7, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman. (Hartnett, David)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman. (Hartnett, David)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8185062.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hartnett, David)
January 7, 2022 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman v. EVE Energy North American Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, as subrogee of James Coleman
Represented By: David Caldwell Hartnett
Represented By: William Neil Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVE Energy North American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Dahmash doing business as Virginia Beach Tobacco, Inc. and Virginia Beach Tobacco and Vape
Represented By: Shawn Ashley Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Mohammed Dahmash
Represented By: Shawn Ashley Voyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: William Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Premium Estore LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ecigsdirect.us
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?