Patrick et al v. KHL, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Jessica Burciaga, Jessica Hinton, Joanna Krupa, Laurie Young, Masha Lund, Ursula Mayes, Carmen Electra, Jessica 'Jessa' Hinton, Laurie Romeo and Malu Lund
Defendant: KHL, INC. d/b/a GETAWAY CLUB, John Does 1-5, KHL Inc. also known as Getaway doing business as Getaway Club and Getaway
Case Number: 2:2023cv00215
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth W Hanes
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Lanham Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jessica Burciaga, Jessica 'Jessa' Hinton, Joanna Krupa, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Masha Lund, Ursula Mayes, Tara Leigh Patrick, Laurie Young. (Walkinshaw, Paul)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's deadline to file a response brief shall be 7/13/2023 and Defendants' reply shall be due 7/19/2023. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 6/30/2023. (dbra, )
June 29, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jessica Burciaga, Jessica 'Jessa' Hinton, Joanna Krupa, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Masha Lund, Ursula Mayes, Tara Leigh Patrick, Laurie Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walkinshaw, Paul)
June 23, 2023 Refer for 16(b) (jhie, )
June 22, 2023 Filing 10 Brief in Support to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KHL Inc.. (Oakley, David)
June 22, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by KHL Inc.. (Oakley, David)
June 22, 2023 Filing 8 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by KHL Inc.. (Oakley, David)
June 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Brandt Oakley on behalf of KHL Inc. (Oakley, David)
June 9, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laurie Young, Jessica Burciaga, Masha Lund, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Ursula Mayes, Jessica 'Jessa' Hinton, Tara Leigh Patrick, Joanna Krupa KHL Inc. served on 6/1/2023, answer due 6/22/2023 (Walkinshaw, Paul)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for John V. Golaszewski as to Jessica Burciaga, Jessica 'Jessa' Hinton, Joanna Krupa, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Masha Lund, Ursula Mayes, Tara Leigh Patrick, Laurie Young. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 5/30/23. (jhie, )
May 24, 2023 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Vincent Golaszewski and Certification of Local Counsel Paul Thomas Walkinshaw Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8950525. by Jessica Burciaga, Jessica 'Jessa' Hinton, Joanna Krupa, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Masha Lund, Ursula Mayes, Tara Leigh Patrick, Laurie Young. (Walkinshaw, Paul)
May 18, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KHL Inc., NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(jhie, )
May 17, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Jessica Burciaga, Jessica 'Jessa' Hinton, Joanna Krupa, Jaime Edmondson Longoria, Masha Lund, Ursula Mayes, Tara Leigh Patrick, Laurie Young. (Walkinshaw, Paul)
May 16, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
May 16, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8938596.), filed by Tara Leigh Patrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Walkinshaw, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick et al v. KHL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Edmondson Longoria
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Krupa
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Young
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masha Lund
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Electra
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica 'Jessa' Hinton
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Romeo
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malu Lund
Represented By: Paul Thomas Walkinshaw
Represented By: Timothy D. Fisher
Represented By: John V. Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHL, INC. d/b/a GETAWAY CLUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHL Inc. also known as Getaway doing business as Getaway Club
Represented By: David Brandt Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getaway
Represented By: David Brandt Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?