House et al v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Cheryl House and Douglas House
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma, S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc., Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd. and Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00235
Filed: May 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth W Hanes
Referring Judge: Robert J Krask
2 Judge: Jamar K Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 7/20/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
July 19, 2023 Filing 26 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Christopher Elliott and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd by Cheryl House, Douglas House. (Floyd, Lee)
July 19, 2023 Notice of Correction re #25 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Christopher Elliott and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd . The motion does not match the docket entry regarding parties represented. Counsel should refile the motion with the corrected information. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
July 18, 2023 Filing 25 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Christopher Elliott and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd by Cheryl House, Douglas House. (Floyd, Lee)
July 17, 2023 Notice of Correction re #23 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Christopher Elliott and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9027922. The motion filed indicates that the applicant is a full-time employee of the United States of America and is requesting exemption from the filing fee. Local counsel should refile the motion with the corrected information. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, )
July 14, 2023 Filing 24 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cheryl House, Douglas House. (Floyd, Lee)
July 14, 2023 Filing 23 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Christopher Elliott and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9027922. by Cheryl House, Douglas House. (Floyd, Lee)
June 29, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Adair Floyd on behalf of Cheryl House, Douglas House (Floyd, Lee)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 6/20/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 6/20/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 6/20/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
June 16, 2023 Filing 18 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Harley Ratliff and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles)
June 16, 2023 Filing 17 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher McRae and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles)
June 16, 2023 Filing 16 Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Nichols and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles)
June 15, 2023 Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes no longer assigned to the case. (afar)
June 14, 2023 Notice of Correction re #13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Harley Ratliff #15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher McRae and #14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Nichols and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne. The motions do not contain the signatures of the applicants. Local counsel should file corrected motions that include the written signatures of the applicants. Counsel should not pay the fees a second time. (tlev, )
June 13, 2023 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher McRae and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8979333. by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles)
June 13, 2023 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Nichols and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8979315. by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles)
June 13, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Harley Ratliff and Certification of Local Counsel Charles Wayne Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8979284. by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Wayne, Charles)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services, Inc.. (Wayne, Charles)
June 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles)
June 1, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of local counsel requirement mailed to foreign counsel. (jhie, )
May 31, 2023 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-09149. Original file and docket sheet received.
May 31, 2023 Notification of transfer of civil case from the Eastern District of Louisiana Case No. 2:17cv9149 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/12/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 15836)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
May 24, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Case Specific) (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6)(McRae, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
May 19, 2023 Filing 6 Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. General (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10, #11 11, #12 12, #13 13, #14 14, #15 15, #16 16, #17 17, #18 18, #19 19, #20 20, #21 21, #22 22, #23 23, #24 24, #25 25, #26 26, #27 27, #28 28, #29 29, #30 30, #31 31, #32 32, #33 33, #34 34, #35 35, #36 36, #37 37, #38 38, #39 39, #40 40, #41 41, #42 42, #43 43, #44 44, #45 45, #46 46, #47 47, #48 48, #49 49, #50 50, #51 51, #52 52, #53 53, #54 54, #55 55, #56 56, #57 57, #58 58, #59 59, #60 60, #61 61, #62 62, #63 63, #64 64, #65 65, #66 66, #67 67, #68 68, #69 69, #70 70, #71 71, #72 72, #73 73, #74 74, #75 75, #76 76, #77 77, #78 78, #79 79, #80 80, #81 81, #82 82, #83 83, #84 84, #85 85, #86 86, #87 87, #88 88, #89 89, #90 90, #91 91, #92 92, #93 93, #94 94, #95 95, #96 96, #97 97, #98 98, #99 99, #100 100, #101 101, #102 102, #103 103, #104 104, #105 105, #106 106, #107 107, #108 108, #109 109, #110 110, #111 111, #112 112, #113 113, #114 114, #115 115, #116 116)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
September 21, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]
September 15, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6361668) filed by Douglas House, Cheryl House. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Thomas A. Stringer added to party Cheryl House(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas A. Stringer added to party Douglas House(pty:pla).(Stringer, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/31/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: House et al v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Stephen Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Stephen Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharma Global FZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Harley Victor Ratliff
Represented By: Adrienne L Byard
Represented By: Christopher J Kaufman
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Matt DePaz
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Harley Ratliff
Represented By: Stephen Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraco Pharmaceutical Laboratories, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl House
Represented By: Thomas A. Stringer
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Nathan Buttars
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas House
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Thomas A. Stringer
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Represented By: Nathan Buttars
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?