Coles et al v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Tracie Coles and Arthur Coles
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma, S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00561
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert J Krask
Referring Judge: Jamar K Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 12/21/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
December 20, 2023 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Christopher Elliott and Certification of Local Counsel Lee Floyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9275516. by Arthur Coles, Tracie Coles. (Floyd, Lee)
December 20, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Adair Floyd on behalf of Arthur Coles, Tracie Coles (Floyd, Lee)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. No qualified local counsel has yet entered an appearance on behalf of the plaintiffs. Accordingly, counsel for the plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why their appearances in this case should not be stricken. If local counsel for the plaintiffs does not enter an appearance within 14 days of this Order, counsel for the plaintiffs will be stricken from the docket sheet and the plaintiffs will have to proceed pro se. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 12/18/23.
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 11/15/2023. (Walker, Jamar)
November 14, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher McRae and Certification of Local Counsel Olivia Houston Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9218164. by Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Houston, Olivia)
November 14, 2023 Filing 12 Clerk's NOTICE of local counsel requirement (jhie, )
November 9, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Houston on behalf of Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Houston, Olivia)
November 9, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services, Inc.. (Wayne, Charles)
November 9, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Wayne, Charles)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-08769. Original file and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2023 Notification of transfer of civil case from the Eastern District of Louisiana Case No. 2:17cv8769 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (Filed at Doc. 16511, MDL 2740)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by All Defendants. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
September 12, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Payton, Paige) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
September 8, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6347550) filed by Tracie Coles, Arthur Coles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Thomas A. Stringer added to party Arthur Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas A. Stringer added to party Tracie Coles(pty:pla).(Stringer, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coles et al v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Olivia Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Coles
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: Thomas A. Stringer
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Nathan Buttars
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Coles
Represented By: Thomas A. Stringer
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Nathan Buttars
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?