Russo v. Model Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Russo
Defendant: Model Transport, LLC, BSL Logistics, LLC and Angesom Ghebrendrias
Case Number: 2:2023cv00611
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth W Hanes
Referring Judge: Douglas E Miller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle/Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on BLS Logistics, LLC-BOC-3 Agent on 01/11/2024, filed by John Russo. (Holt, David)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jessica Lynn Lanifero as to Plaintiff John Russo. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 01/26/2024. (Bcorn, )
January 23, 2024 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica L. Lanifero and Certification of Local Counsel David B. Holt Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9322396. by John Russo. (Holt, David)
January 19, 2024 Filing 17 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by BSL Logistics, LLC. (Jebo, James)
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BSL Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Bill of Sale)(Jebo, James)
January 19, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BSL Logistics, LLC. (Jebo, James)
January 16, 2024 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Angesom Ghebrendrias on 12/05/2023, filed by John Russo. (Holt, David)
January 11, 2024 Filing 14 Affidavit of Compliance for Service on Angesom Ghebrendrias received on 1/11/2024 (jhie, )
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice for Joseph Vincent Camerlengo, Jr as to John Russo. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 01/08/2024. (tlev, )
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVITS for Service on the Secretary of the Commonwealth as to BSL Logistics, LLC; Model Transport, LLC. (jhie, )
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to BSL Logistics, LLC, Model Transport, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(jhie, )
January 3, 2024 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph V. Camerlengo and Certification of Local Counsel David B. Holt Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9291899. by John Russo. (Holt, David)
January 3, 2024 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by John Russo. (Holt, David)
January 3, 2024 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by John Russo. (Holt, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Four (4) Summonses Issued as to BSL Logistics, LLC, Angesom Ghebrendrias, Model Transport, LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
November 30, 2023 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, )
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by John Russo. (Holt, David)
November 30, 2023 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by John Russo. (Holt, David)
November 30, 2023 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by John Russo. (Holt, David)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by John Russo. (Holt, David)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-9242871.), filed by John Russo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Holt, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russo v. Model Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Russo
Represented By: David Barnes Holt
Represented By: Craig Stewart Gill, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Mark Smith
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Lanifero
Represented By: Joseph Vincent Camerlengo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Model Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSL Logistics, LLC
Represented By: James Rhea Jebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angesom Ghebrendrias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?