WIAV Solutions LLC v. Research In Motion, Ltd. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: WIAV Solutions LLC
Defendant: Research In Motion, Ltd., Research in Motion Corp., Apple Inc. and Mindspeed Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00627
Filed: September 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Patent Office
County: Fairfax
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Payne
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:281 Patent Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/23/09. (kyou, )
January 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Apple, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/23/09. (kyou, )
January 12, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple, Inc. by WIAV Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal of Defendant Apple, Inc.)(Eckstein, Maya)
January 12, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by WIAV Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2))(Eckstein, Maya)
January 6, 2009 for proceedings held before District Judge Robert E. Payne: Telephone Conference held on 1/6/2009. (sneal, )
October 14, 2008 So Ordered 12 MOTION for Attorney David Paul Swenson to appear Pro hac vice filed by WIAV Solutions LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/10/08. (lsal)
October 14, 2008 So Ordered 11 MOTION for Attorney Ronald James Schutz to appear Pro hac vice filed by WIAV Solutions LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/10/08. (lsal)
October 14, 2008 So Ordered 10 MOTION for Attorney Andrea Kloehn Naef to appear Pro hac vice filed by WIAV Solutions LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/10/08. (lsal)
October 14, 2008 So Ordered 9 MOTION for Attorney Jacob Matthew Anthony Holdreith to appear Pro hac vice filed by WIAV Solutions LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/10/08. (lsal)
October 14, 2008 So Ordered 8 MOTION for Attorney Reena Ishver Desai to appear Pro hac vice filed by WIAV Solutions LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/10/08. (lsal)
October 14, 2008 So Ordered 7 MOTION for Attorney Sang Young Adam Brodie to appear Pro hac vice filed by WIAV Solutions LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/10/08. (lsal)
October 10, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory N. Stillman on behalf of WIAV Solutions LLC (Stillman, Gregory)
October 7, 2008 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney David Paul Swenson to appear Pro hac vice by WIAV Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(lsal)
October 7, 2008 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Ronald James Schutz to appear Pro hac vice by WIAV Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(lsal)
October 7, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Andrea Kloehn Naef to appear Pro hac vice by WIAV Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(lsal)
October 7, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Jacob Matthew Anthony Holdreith to appear Pro hac vice by WIAV Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(lsal)
October 7, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Reena Ishver Desai to appear Pro hac vice by WIAV Solutions LLC (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(lsal)
October 7, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Sang Young Adam Brodie to appear Pro hac vice by WIAV Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(lsal)
October 6, 2008 Filing 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Mindspeed Technologies, Inc..(Noona, Stephen)
October 6, 2008 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mindspeed Technologies, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen)
October 6, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edward Noona on behalf of Mindspeed Technologies, Inc. (Noona, Stephen)
September 29, 2008 Filing 14 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark form completed and mailed to Patent and Trademark Office; (lsal)
September 26, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mindspeed Technologies, Inc., Research In Motion, Ltd., Research in Motion Corp., Apple Inc.; attorney telephoned for pickup as instructed in cover letter; (lsal)
September 26, 2008 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by WIAV Solutions LLC. (lsal)
September 26, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mindspeed Technologies, Inc., Research In Motion, Ltd., Research in Motion Corp., Apple Inc. (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 34683000643) filed by WIAV Solutions LLC (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10)(lsal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WIAV Solutions LLC v. Research In Motion, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WIAV Solutions LLC
Represented By: David Paul Swenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindspeed Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?