Dozier Internet Law, P.C. v. Riley et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Dozier Internet Law, P.C.
Defendant: Ronald J. Riley, Inventored, Inc., Riley Consulting Corporation, Riley Enterprises, LTD and The Alliance for American Innovation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv00643
Filed: October 2, 2008
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Henrico
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Hudson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2008 20 Featured Case ORDER denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 12/05/2008. Copies to counsel. (cmcc, )
December 4, 2008 19 Memorandum in Support re 18 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Dozier Internet Law, P.C.. (Morris, Donald)
December 4, 2008 18 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Dozier Internet Law, P.C.. (Morris, Donald)
November 28, 2008 17 Report on the Determination of an Action Regarding a Trademark; mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (walk, )
November 20, 2008 16 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion to Remand to State Court and this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the County of Henrico, Virginia. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/20/2008. Certified copy mailed to the Clerk of the Henrico County Circuit Court. (walk, )
November 18, 2008 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Ronald J. Riley(an individual), Inventored, Inc.(a Michigan corporation), Riley Consulting Corporation, Riley Enterprises, LTD, The Alliance for American Innovation, LLC(a Michigan corporation).(Wolf, Thomas)
November 17, 2008 14 Rebuttal Brief re 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dozier Internet Law, P.C.. (Morris, Donald)
November 13, 2008 13 Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION to Strike Impertinent and Scandalous "Background Information" Allegations filed by Ronald J. Riley(an individual), Inventored, Inc.(a Michigan corporation), Riley Consulting Corporation, Riley Enterprises, LTD, The Alliance for American Innovation, LLC(a Michigan corporation). (Wolf, Thomas)
November 13, 2008 12 MOTION to Strike Impertinent and Scandalous "Background Information" Allegations by Ronald J. Riley(an individual), Inventored, Inc.(a Michigan corporation), Riley Consulting Corporation, Riley Enterprises, LTD. (Wolf, Thomas)
November 13, 2008 11 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ronald J. Riley(an individual), Inventored, Inc.(a Michigan corporation), Riley Consulting Corporation, Riley Enterprises, LTD, The Alliance for American Innovation, LLC(a Michigan corporation). (Wolf, Thomas)
November 12, 2008 10 Memorandum in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ronald J. Riley(an individual), Inventored, Inc.(a Michigan corporation), Riley Consulting Corporation, Riley Enterprises, LTD, The Alliance for American Innovation, LLC(a Michigan corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Wolf, Thomas)
November 7, 2008 9 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment # 1 Pretrial Schedule A (signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/7/2008) (rpiz)
November 7, 2008 8 Featured Case ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2008 at 11:10 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz)
October 29, 2008 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Dozier Internet Law, P.C.. (Morris, Donald)
October 29, 2008 6 Memorandum in Support re 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Dozier Internet Law, P.C.. (Morris, Donald)
October 29, 2008 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dozier Internet Law, P.C.. (Morris, Donald)
October 23, 2008 4 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion by Ronald J. Riley, Inventored, Inc., Riley Consulting Corporation, Riley Enterprises, LTD, The Alliance for American Innovation, LLC and Ronald J. Riley for the Admission of Paul Alan Levy, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/22/2008. (walk, )
October 20, 2008 3 MOTION by Ronald J. Riley (an individual), Inventored, Inc. (a Michigan corporation), Riley Consulting Corporation, Riley Enterprises, LTD, and The Alliance for American Innovation, LLC (a Michigan corporation) for the Admission of Paul A. Levy, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. (Attachment: # 1 Receipt). (walk, )
October 6, 2008 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Trademark; mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (walk, )
October 2, 2008 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Ronald J. Riley (an individual), Inventored, Inc.(a Michigan corporation), Riley Consulting Corporation, Riley Enterprises, LTD, and The Alliance for American Innovation, LLC, (a Michigan corporation) from Henrico County Circuit Court, Case Number: CL08-2123. Filing Fee Paid: $350.00, Receipt Number: 34683000732. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and # 2 Receipt). (walk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dozier Internet Law, P.C. v. Riley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dozier Internet Law, P.C.
Represented By: John Wesley Dozier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald J. Riley
Represented By: Thomas Marshall Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inventored, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Marshall Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Consulting Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Marshall Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Enterprises, LTD
Represented By: Thomas Marshall Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alliance for American Innovation, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Marshall Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?