May 20, 2010 |
Filing 69
Reply to 68 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Perrin, Robin)
|
May 14, 2010 |
Filing 68
Memorandum in Opposition re 67 MOTION Permanent Relief filed by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Chapter 449, # 2 Exhibit 2, Chapter 538, # 3 Exhibit 3, May 3, 2010 E-mail from FVAP, # 4 Exhibit 4, May 4, 2010 E-mail from FVAP)(Dybing, Robert)
|
May 11, 2010 |
Filing 67
MOTION Permanent Relief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perrin, Robin)
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing 66
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Perrin, Robin)
|
February 3, 2010 |
Filing 65
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA regarding future relief (Perrin, Robin)
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing 64
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA regarding Future Relief (Perrin, Robin)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 63
NOTICE by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues Supplementing Earlier Notice, with Amended Vote Totals (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Certified Election Results, # 2 Exhibit 2, Amended Election Results)(Dybing, Robert)
|
November 25, 2009 |
Filing 62
NOTICE by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues of Re-Certification of Election Results (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Re-Certified Election Results)(Dybing, Robert)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing 61
CONSENT ORDER. (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 11/12/09. (jtho, )
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing 60
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA regarding Future Relief (Perrin, Robin)
|
November 4, 2009 |
Filing 59
STATUS REPORT Jointly Submitted by Plaintiff and Defendant Pursuant to October 15, 2009 Final Order by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing 58
FINAL ORDER denying defendant's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting plaintiff's 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. (SEE Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 10/15/09. (jtho, )
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing 57
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 10/15/09. (jtho, )
|
October 15, 2009 |
Filing 56
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript re 54 Transcript. (jtho, )
|
October 14, 2009 |
Filing 55
Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Perrin, Robin)
|
October 14, 2009 |
Filing 54
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/09/2099, before Judge Hon. Richard L. Williams. Court Reporter Gil Halasz, RMR, Telephone number 804.916.2248. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2010.(halasz, gil)
|
October 8, 2009 |
Set Hearing: Conference Call set for 10/9/2009 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Richard L. Williams. (wtuc)
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing 53
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript 52 . (jtho, )
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing 52
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/05/09, Court ReporterGil Halasz, RMR, Telephone number 804.916.2248. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2010.(halasz, gil)
|
October 5, 2009 |
Filing 51
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Richard L. Williams (Court Reporter Halasz, OCR): Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2009 re 43 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues, Jean Cunningham and 47 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by the United States. Argument heard. Matter taken under advisement by Court. (rpiz)
|
September 22, 2009 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2009 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Dennis W. Dohnal. (dtho, )
|
September 18, 2009 |
Filing 50
REPLY to Response to Motion re 47 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Perrin, Robin)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing 49
Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/05/09 re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Dybing, Robert)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Set as to 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 47 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Richard L. Williams. (wtuc)
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing 48
Memorandum in Opposition re 47 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 47
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Perrin, Robin)
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing 46
AGREED SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE ORDER; it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment, if any, shall be filed by 8/28/09; defts' Opposition and Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed by 9/11/09; and plaintiff's reply brief, if any, shall be filed by 9/18/09. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 7/21/09. (jtho, )
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing 45
Consent MOTION Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Perrin, Robin)
|
July 17, 2009 |
Filing 44
Memorandum in Support re 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Affidavit of Nancy Rodrigues, # 2 Exhibit 2, Testimony of Gail McGinn, # 3 Exhibit 3, Senate Bill 1415)(Dybing, Robert)
|
July 17, 2009 |
Filing 43
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
June 10, 2009 |
Filing 42
SO-ORDER granting 41 Motion for Richard Dellheim to appear Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 6/10/09. (jtho, )
|
June 8, 2009 |
Filing 41
MOTION for Richard Dellheim to appear Pro hac vice by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (jtho, )
|
January 23, 2009 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dennis W. Dohnal: Settlement Conference held on 1/23/2009. (2:45) (dtho, )
|
December 10, 2008 |
Filing 40
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 8, 2008 before Judge Richard L. Williams. Court Reporter: Gilbert F. Halasz. (15 pages, placed in brown expandable file) (jtho, )
|
December 9, 2008 |
Filing 39
ORDER denying 27 Motion to Dismiss; counsel are DIRECTED to jointly contact Chambers of Honorable U.S. Magistrate Dennis W. Dohnal within ten (10) days of date of this Order to schedule settlement conference; counsel are ORDERED to have with them at settlement conference parties with settlement authority; and what if any, additional requirements Judge Dohnal requires prior to conference. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 12/8/08. (jtho, )
|
December 8, 2008 |
Filing 38
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Richard L. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 12/8/2008 re 27 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention filed by Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues, Jean Cunningham; motion denied (Court Reporter G. Halasz, OCR.) (wtuc)
|
December 2, 2008 |
Filing 37
Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
December 1, 2008 |
Filing 36
Memorandum in Opposition re 27 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit)(Perrin, Robin)
|
November 26, 2008 |
Filing 35
ORDER granting United States' 34 Consent Motion to Amend its Complaint and that the Motion to Dismiss, Memo in Support and Answer filed by defts Cunningham, Rodrigues and Pyon is deemed to have been filed by Virginia State Board of Elections and the Commonwealth of Virginia in response to Complaint in Intervention. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 11/26/08. (jtho, )
|
November 26, 2008 |
Filing 34
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 17 Intervenor Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Perrin, Robin)
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing 33
MOTION for Pro hac vice by Alberto Ruisanchez by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (wtuc)
|
November 17, 2008 |
Set as to 27 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention: Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2008 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Richard L. Williams. (wtuc)
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing 32
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Richard L. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2008 re 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, 16 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues, Jean Cunningham, 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; motion to intervene granted; motion to dismiss complaint of McCain Palin 2008, Inc. and Thelma Drake for Congress granted; Hearing on motion to dismiss govt compliant to be held Dec. 8, 2008 at 2:30 p.m.; order to enter (Court Reporter G. Halasz, OCR.) (wtuc, )
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing 31
ORDER granting 16 United States' unopposed Motion to Intervene; grants 12 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff McCain-Palin and DENIES McCain-Palin's request to remain in suit as a permissive intervenor; denying 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and temporary restraining order; the plaintiff U.S. shall have until 12/1/08 to respond to defts'motion to dismiss its complaint; defts shall have until 12/3/08 to reply to plaintiff's response; hearing on motion to dismiss is scheduled for 2:30 p.m on 12/8/08. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 11/17/08. (jtho, )
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing 30
RESPONSE to Motion re 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by the United States, filed by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Piepgrass, Stephen)
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing 29
RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc.. (Piepgrass, Stephen)
|
November 16, 2008 |
Filing 28
Memorandum in Support re 27 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention filed by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
November 16, 2008 |
Filing 27
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint in Intervention by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
November 16, 2008 |
Filing 26
ANSWER to Intervenor Complaint by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues.(Dybing, Robert)
|
November 16, 2008 |
Filing 25
Memorandum in Opposition re 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 24
Response to 16 MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support filed by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 23
Supplementary Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Supplementary filed by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 22
NOTICE by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc. re 14 Amended Complaint Withdrawal of Proposed Amended Complaint (Piepgrass, Stephen)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 21
Memorandum in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss , Supplemental filed by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc.. (Piepgrass, Stephen)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 20
Memorandum in Support re 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Proposed Order)(Perrin, Robin)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 19
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Perrin, Robin)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 18
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Perrin, Robin) ***Motion Terminated re: 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Document terminated because incorrect document attached. Counsel will re-file motion with correct document attached momentarily.
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 17
Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Perrin, Robin)
|
November 14, 2008 |
Filing 16
MOTION to Intervene and Memorandum in Support by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Perrin, Robin)
|
November 7, 2008 |
Filing 15
Memorandum in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc.. (Piepgrass, Stephen)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 14
(WITHDRAWN) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues, filed by Thelma Drake for Congress, McCain-Palin 2008, Inc.(Piepgrass, Stephen) Modified docket text on 11/17/2008 (jtho, ).
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 13
Memorandum in Support re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 12
MOTION to Dismiss by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues. (Dybing, Robert)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing 11
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues.(Dybing, Robert)
|
November 6, 2008 |
Set Hearings: Omnibus Hearing RESCHEDULED for 11/17/2008 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Richard L. Williams. (wtuc)
|
November 5, 2008 |
Set Hearings: Omnibus Hearing RESCHEDULED for 11/17/2008 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Richard L. Williams. (wtuc)
|
November 4, 2008 |
Filing 10
ORDER GRANTING plaintiff's 2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and the 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; the defendants shall convey a copy of this Order to: the local electoral boards and registrars by means of the local registrars' email addresses by 5:00 p.m. on November 5, 2008; and the clerk's of Virginia circuit courts by 5:00 p.m. November 5, 2008 or within six (6) hours of the plaintiff providing the defendants with the email addresses, or only if email addresses are unavailable, the fax numbers for these clerks, whichever is later (see additional deadlines in Order); the defendants shall respond to the merits of this matter by 5:00 p.m. on November 6, 2008; the plaintiff's reply, if any, is due by 1:00 p.m. on November 7, 2008. A hearing on this matter will be held at 2:30 p.m. on November 10, 2008. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 11/4/2008. Copies sent as directed. (lhin, )
|
November 4, 2008 |
Filing 9
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Richard L. Williams: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2008 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc; order to enter by 5 p.m. today with the Court's full ruling (Court Reporter G. Halasz, OCR.) (wtuc) (wtuc, ).
|
November 4, 2008 |
Filing 8
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jean Cunningham served on 11/3/2008, answer due 11/24/2008; Harold Pyon served on 11/3/2008, answer due 11/24/2008; Nancy Rodrigues served on 11/3/2008, answer due 11/24/2008. (jtho, )
|
November 4, 2008 |
Filing 7
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Dybing on behalf of Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues (Dybing, Robert)
|
November 4, 2008 |
RESET Deadline as to 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2008 to now be held at 02:00 PM before District Judge Richard L. Williams. (time changed) (wtuc)
|
November 4, 2008 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing set for 11/10/2008 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Richard L. Williams. (khan, )
|
November 3, 2008 |
Filing 6
Summons Issued as to Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues (given to courier at counter). (jtho, )
|
November 3, 2008 |
Filing 5
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc. (jtho, )
|
November 3, 2008 |
Filing 4
Memorandum in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(jtho, )
|
November 3, 2008 |
Filing 3
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc. (jtho, )
|
November 3, 2008 |
Filing 2
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc. (jtho, )
|
November 3, 2008 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against Jean Cunningham, Harold Pyon, Nancy Rodrigues ( Filing fee: $350.00; receipt number 34683001130), filed by McCain-Palin 2008, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Receipt)(jtho, )
|
November 3, 2008 |
Set Deadlines as to 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2008 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Richard L. Williams. (wtuc)
|