Central Telephone Company of Virginia et al v. Sprint Communications Company of Virginia, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Central Telephone Company of Virginia, United Telephone Southeast, LLC, Embarq Florida, Inc., United Telephone Company of Indiana, Inc., United Telephone Company of Kansas, United Telephone Company of Eastern Kansas, United Telephone Company of Southcentral Kansas, Embarq Missouri, Inc., Embarq Minnesota, Inc., United Telephone Company of the West, Central Telephone Company, United Telephone Company of New Jersey, Inc., Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC, United Telephone of Ohio, United Telephone Company of the Northwest, The United Telephone Company of Pennsylvania, LLC, United Telephone Company of the Carolinas LLC, United Telephone Company of Texas, Inc. and Central Telephone Company of Texas
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company of Virginia, Inc. and Sprint Communications Company LP
Case Number: 3:2009cv00720
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Richmond
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Payne
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 47:0332 Telecommuncations Act of 1996
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/13/11. (jtho, )
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 12/12/11. (jtho, )
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/30/2011. (lhin, )
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM OPINION. For the reasons set forth, judgment will be entered for the Plaintiffs for compensatory damages and late charges in stipulated amounts or pursuant to decision based on briefs to be filed as required by the Order entered on February 18, 2011(see order for details). Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/1/2011. (lhin, )
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Memorandum Opinion: Centurylink's Objections to the Magistrate's Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 43) are sustained and the defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies, or Alternatively, to Stay this Case under the Doctrine of Primary Jurisdiction (Docket No. 9) is DENIED; and the Motion for Leave to Supplement the Appendix to Centurylink's Opposition to Sprint's Motion to Dismiss or Stay (Docket No. 20) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 1/3/2011. (lhin)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Telephone Company of Virginia et al v. Sprint Communications Company of Virginia, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Telephone Company of Virginia
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Southeast, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embarq Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Company of Indiana, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Company of Kansas
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Company of Eastern Kansas
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Company of Southcentral Kansas
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embarq Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embarq Minnesota, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Company of the West
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Telephone Company
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Company of New Jersey, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone of Ohio
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Company of the Northwest
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United Telephone Company of Pennsylvania, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Company of the Carolinas LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Telephone Company of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Telephone Company of Texas
Represented By: Michael J. Lockerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Communications Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?