Bralley et al v. Carey et al
Plaintiff: Noel Bralley, Carolyn Bralley and Braxton J. Bralley
Defendant: Mark A. Carey, Frank Cross, Joan Doe No. 1, Joan Doe No. 2, Joan Doe No. 3, Joan Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2 and Law Offices of Mark A. Carey, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00138
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Chesapeake City
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Payne
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 3/31/2021. Copy mailed to pro se defendant. (jsmi, )
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 2/2/2012. Copies to counsel and to Defendants at their address of record and by email.(cmcc, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER adopting 62 the Report and Recommendation; further, granting 46 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs Associated With Collection of the Judgment Entered Against Defendants Mark A. Carey and the Law Offices of Mark A. Ca rey, P.C.; the Plaintiffs are awarded a sum of $27,296.58; and the Plaintiffs are granted leave to submit additional petitions for attorney's fees at the appropriate time if necessary. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 10/3/2011. Copies to counsel and to defendants by mail. (cmcc, )
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Judgment on Settlement; the Motion for Judgment on Settlement is granted and the Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the Plaintiffs against the Defendants, Mark A. Carey and The Law Offices of Mark A. Carey, P.C., jo intly and severally in the amount of $15,000.00 together with interest thereon at the rate of 0.22 percent (0.22%) per annum from November 12, 2010 until paid. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/12/2010. Copies to counsel. (cmcc, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bralley et al v. Carey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel Bralley
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Bralley
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braxton J. Bralley
Represented By: Dale Wood Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Carey
Represented By: Mark Richard Colombell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Doe No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Doe No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Doe No. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Doe No. 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Offices of Mark A. Carey, P.C.
Represented By: Mark Richard Colombell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?