Dick v. Fahey Featured Case
Petitioner: Joseph J. Dick, Jr.
Respondent: Helen Fahey
Case Number: 3:2010cv00505
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Richard L. Williams
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion by Joseph J. Dick, Jr. for the Admission of George H. Kendall, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 10/4/2010. (lhin, )
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion by Joseph J. Dick, Jr. for the Admission of Corrine A. Irish, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Richard L. Williams on 10/4/2010. (lhin, )
September 30, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for George Haywood Kendall to appear Pro hac vice by Joseph J. Dick, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(cmcc, )
September 30, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION for Corrine Anetra Irish to appear Pro hac vice by Joseph J. Dick, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt)(cmcc, )
August 9, 2010 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to Motion re 2 MOTION to Stay re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph J. Dick, Jr. (Worthington, Rebecca)
August 5, 2010 Filing 5 Brief in Support to 4 Objection to Petitioner's Motion to Stay and Hold Proceedings in Abeyance filed by Helen Fahey. (Theisen, Virginia)
August 5, 2010 Filing 4 Objection to Petitioner's Motion to Stay and Hold Proceedings in Abeyance filed by Helen Fahey. (Theisen, Virginia)
July 23, 2010 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 34683009189 (tdai, )
July 23, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay and Abey re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Joseph J. Dick, Jr. (tdai, )
July 23, 2010 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joseph J. Dick, Jr. Fee paid. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter)(tdai, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2010: # 3 Declaration of Joseph Jesse Dick, Jr.) (tdai, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dick v. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph J. Dick, Jr.
Represented By: Harmony Loube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Helen Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?