Intercarrier Communications, LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Intercarrier Communications, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00764
Filed: October 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Richmond City
Presiding Judge: John A. Gibney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be born by each party incurring the same. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 04/18/2013. (walk, )
April 18, 2013 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Intercarrier Communications, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Butler, Harris)
April 4, 2013 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on March 28, 2013, before Judge Judge Gibney, Court Reporter/Transcriber Krista Liscio, Telephone number 804 916-2296. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2013.(liscio, krista)
March 28, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Tutorial Hearing set for 5/9/2013 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney Jr.. (sneal, )
March 28, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Markman Hearing set for 6/21/2013 at 12:30 PM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney Jr.. (sneal, )
March 28, 2013 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Parties by counsel. Arguments had by counsel. Motion taken under advisement by the Court. Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2013 re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Apple, Inc.. (Court Reporter Krista Liscio, OCR.)(sneal, ) Modified on 4/4/2013 (sneal, ).
February 28, 2013 Filing 28 Reply to Motion re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Walter D. Kelley, Jr., # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Kelley, Walter)
February 25, 2013 Set as to 20 MOTION to Transfer Case: Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 at 09:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (wtuc)
February 22, 2013 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Intercarrier Communications, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cassandra Klingman, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Declaration of Timothy J. Lorello, # 23 Declaration of Marvin E. Key)(Butler, Harris)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 17 Motion by Apple, Inc. for the Admission of Michelle Stover, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 02/08/2013. (walk, )
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion by Apple, Inc. for the Admission of William C. Rooklidge, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 02/08/2013. (walk, )
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion by Apple, Inc. for the Admission of Frank P. Cote, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 02/08/2013. (walk, )
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion by Apple, Inc. for the Admission of Mark A. Finkelstein, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 02/08/2013. (walk, )
February 8, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case (Request for Hearing) (Kelley, Walter)
February 8, 2013 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support re 20 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Buckley, # 2 Declaration of Walter D. Kelley, Jr., # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Appendix)(Kelley, Walter)
February 8, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kelley, Walter)
February 8, 2013 Filing 19 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Apple, Inc..(Kelley, Walter)
February 8, 2013 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Apple, Inc.. (Kelley, Walter)
February 8, 2013 Filing 17 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michelle Stover and Certification of Local Counsel Tara Lynn R. Zurawski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3391567. by Apple, Inc.. (Zurawski, Tara)
February 8, 2013 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William C. Rooklidge and Certification of Local Counsel Tara Lynn R. Zurawski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3391564. by Apple, Inc.. (Zurawski, Tara)
February 8, 2013 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark. A. Finkelstein and Certification of Local Counsel Tara Lynn R. Zurawski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3391557. by Apple, Inc.. (Zurawski, Tara)
February 8, 2013 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Frank P. Cote and Certification of Local Counsel Tara Lynn R. Zurawski Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3391540. by Apple, Inc.. (Zurawski, Tara)
February 8, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lynn Renee Zurawski on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Zurawski, Tara)
February 8, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Dekalb Kelley, Jr on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Kelley, Walter)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding the Parties' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint; it is ORDERED that the Consent Motion filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. is GRANTED and Defendant shall have through February 8, 2013, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 12/27/2012. Copies to counsel. (cmcc, )
December 21, 2012 Filing 10 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to the Complaint by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Walter D. Kelley, Jr.)
December 6, 2012 Filing 9 Certificate of Compliance by Intercarrier Communications, LLC. Apple, Inc. served on 12/06/2012, Answer due 12/27/2012. (walk, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 6 Motion by Intercarrier Communications, LLC for the Admission of Xiang Yu, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. (walk, )
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 5 Motion by Intercarrier Communications, LLC for the Admission of Timothy Devlin, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 11/19/2012. (walk, )
November 16, 2012 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Xiang Yu and Certification of Local Counsel Harris D. Butler Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3289041. by Intercarrier Communications, LLC. (Butler, Harris)
November 16, 2012 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Timothy Devlin and Certification of Local Counsel Harris D. Butler Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3289021. by Intercarrier Communications, LLC. (Butler, Harris)
October 30, 2012 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Patent Number: 6,985,748. (walk, )
October 30, 2012 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.; picked up by Counsel for Plaintiff. (walk, )
October 26, 2012 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Intercarrier Communications, LLC.. (walk, )
October 26, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed by Intercarrier Communications, LLC against Apple, Inc.. (Filing Fee Paid: $350.00, Receipt Number: 34683018862). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Receipt and # 4 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiff). (walk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intercarrier Communications, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intercarrier Communications, LLC
Represented By: Harris Dewey Butler, III
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Represented By: Rebecca H. Royals
Represented By: Xiang Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?