Buholtz v. Carroll et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Leo Buholtz
Defendant: Bart Carroll, Delia Guillamondegui, John Specia, Billy Lanier, Terry Box and W. Kenneth Paxton
Case Number: 3:2015cv00520
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Richmond Office
County: Petersburg City
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Hudson
Presiding Judge: Roderick C. Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. See for complete details. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 08/07/2017. (mailed copy to pro se plaintiff) (nbrow)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION. See for complete details. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 06/29/2017. (mailed copy to pro se Plaintiff) (nbrow)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION (Denying Rule 59(e) Motion). See for complete details. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 03/14/2016. Clerk mailed copy to pro se Plaintiff. (nbrow)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Please read for complete details. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 01/15/2016. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (ccol, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buholtz v. Carroll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Leo Buholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delia Guillamondegui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Specia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Lanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Kenneth Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?